EP0367150 - Intake system for an internal combustion engine with supercharger [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.1995 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.12.1995 [1995/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/19] | For all designated states Mazda Motor Corporation No. 3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hitomi, Mitsuo 51-7, Kurakake 2-chome Asakita-ku Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima-ken / JP | 02 /
Hinatase, Fumio 12582-112, Kumano-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima-ken / JP | 03 /
Nishikawa, Toshio 15-3-9, Nakano 6-chome Aki-ku Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima-ken / JP | 04 /
Takeuchi, Nobuo 2-35, Koiso-cho Minami-ku Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima-ken / JP | [1990/19] | Representative(s) | Gossel, Hans K., et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/45] | Gossel, Hans K., Dipl.-Ing., et al Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1990/19] | Gossel, Hans K., Dipl.-Ing. Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89120020.6 | 27.10.1989 | [1990/19] | Priority number, date | JP19880274120 | 29.10.1988 Original published format: JP 27412088 | [1990/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0367150 | Date: | 09.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0367150 | Date: | 25.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0367150 | Date: | 28.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F02B33/44, F02B37/12, F02B27/02, F02D23/00, F02D13/02 | [1990/29] | CPC: |
F02B27/02 (US);
F02B27/021 (EP);
F02B27/0242 (EP);
F02B27/0252 (EP);
F02B27/0294 (EP);
F02B33/44 (EP,US);
F02B33/446 (EP,US);
F02B37/18 (EP,US);
F02B39/12 (EP,US);
F02D13/0238 (EP,US);
F02B1/04 (EP,US);
F02B2075/1816 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1990/19] | F02B27/02, F02B37/12, F02B39/12, F02D13/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/19] | Title | German: | Einlasssystem für Brennkraftmaschinen mit Auflader | [1990/19] | English: | Intake system for an internal combustion engine with supercharger | [1990/19] | French: | Système d'admission pour un moteur à combustion interne comportant un surchargeur | [1990/19] | Examination procedure | 15.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/03] | 14.01.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 15.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.06.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP60075721 ; | [XP]JP63235624 ; | [A]JP61001836 ; | [A]JP60104717 ; | [A]JP63111227 ; | [A]JP59018226 ; | [YP]DE3908475 (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 9, no. 215 (M-409)(1938) 03 September 1985, & JP-A-60 075721 (HINO JIDOSHA KOGYO K.K.) 30 April 1985,, & JP60075721 A 19850430 | [XP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 25 (M-787) 20 January 89, & JP-A-63 235624 (MAZDA MOTOR CORP.) 30 September 88,, & JP63235624 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 146 (M-482)(2203) 28 May 1986, & JP-A-61 001836 (MAZDA K.K.) 07 January 1986,, & JP61001836 A 19860107 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 9, no. 252 (M-420) 09 October 1985, & JP-A-60 104717 (NISSAN JIDOSHA KK) 10 June 1985,, & JP60104717 A 19850610 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 352 (M-744)(3199) 21 September 1988, & JP-A-63 111227 (MAZDA MOTOR CORP.) 16 May 1988,, & JP63111227 A 19880516 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 8, no. 108 (M-297)(1545) 19 May 1984, & JP-A-59 018226 (AISHIN SEIKI K.K.) 30 January 1984,, & JP59018226 A 19840130 |