EP0372218 - Control process for a pneumatic vehicle suspension [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.12.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.02.1993 [1993/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/14] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1990/24] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GmbH Wernerstrasse 1 D-70469 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fahrnschon, Matthias, Dipl.-Ing. Königstrasse 73 D-6740 Landau / DE | 02 /
Tillhon, Engelbert, Dipl.-Ing. (BA) Reisweg 42 D-7128 Lauffen / DE | [1990/24] | Application number, filing date | 89120161.8 | 31.10.1989 | [1990/24] | Priority number, date | DE19883841476 | 09.12.1988 Original published format: DE 3841476 | [1990/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0372218 | Date: | 13.06.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0372218 | Date: | 27.03.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B60G17/015, B60G17/052 | [1991/22] | CPC: |
B60G17/0155 (EP);
B60G17/0523 (EP);
B60G2202/152 (EP);
B60G2202/412 (EP);
B60G2300/02 (EP);
B60G2300/14 (EP);
B60G2400/252 (EP);
B60G2400/51222 (EP);
B60G2500/20 (EP);
B60G2500/30 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1990/24] | B60G17/015 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT, SE [1990/24] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Regelung einer druckluftgestützten Fahrzeugfederung | [1990/24] | English: | Control process for a pneumatic vehicle suspension | [1990/24] | French: | Procédé de contrôle d'une suspension pneumatique de véhicule | [1990/24] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 14.08.1991 | Examination requested [1991/41] | 03.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.04.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/05] | 10.09.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1993/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.11.1992 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP59100007 ; | [A]EP0170794 ; | [A]DE3430454 ; | [AP]DE3724696 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 8, no. 216 (M-329)(1653) 03 Oktober 1984, & JP-A-59 100007 (ISUZU) 09 Juni 1984,, & JP59100007 A 00000000 |