EP0369238 - Oxygen sensor and method for producing same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.1997 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NGK SPARK PLUG CO., LTD. 14-18, Takatsuji-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/21] | For all designated states NGK SPARK PLUG CO., LTD 14-18, Takatsuji-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kojima, Takao c/o NGK SPARK PLUG Co., Ltd. 14-18, Takatsuji-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi / JP | 02 /
Ishiguro, Hiroyuki c/o NGK SPARK PLUG Co., Ltd. 14-18, Takatsuji-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi / JP | 03 /
Yamano, Masaru c/o NGK SPARK PLUG Co., Ltd. 14-18, Takatsuji-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi / JP | 04 /
Sawada, Toshiki c/o NGK SPARK PLUG Co., Ltd. 14-18, Takatsuji-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi / JP | 05 /
Taguchi, Kazuo c/o NGK SPARK PLUG Co., Ltd. 14-18, Takatsuji-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi / JP | 06 /
Yamada, Masahiko c/o NGK SPARK PLUG Co., Ltd. 14-18, Takatsuji-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi / JP | 07 /
Kondo, Noriaki c/o NGK SPARK PLUG Co., Ltd. 14-18, Takatsuji-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi / JP | [1990/21] | Representative(s) | Diehl & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Erika-Mann-Straße 9 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/37] | Diehl & Partner Patentanwälte Augustenstrasse 46 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [1990/21] | DIEHL GLAESER HILTL & PARTNER Patentanwälte Postfach 19 03 65 D-80603 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89120196.4 | 31.10.1989 | [1990/21] | Priority number, date | JP19880276743 | 01.11.1988 Original published format: JP 27674388 | JP19880276744 | 01.11.1988 Original published format: JP 27674488 | JP19880276302 | 02.11.1988 Original published format: JP 27630288 | JP19880328993 | 28.12.1988 Original published format: JP 32899388 | JP19890063942 | 17.03.1989 Original published format: JP 6394289 | JP19890252025 | 29.09.1989 Original published format: JP 25202589 | [1990/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0369238 | Date: | 23.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0369238 | Date: | 12.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0369238 | Date: | 04.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/416 | [1990/21] | CPC: |
G01N27/4075 (EP,US);
G01N27/4077 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/21] | Title | German: | Sauerstoffempfindlicher Sensor und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung | [1990/21] | English: | Oxygen sensor and method for producing same | [1990/21] | French: | Capteur d'oxygène et procédé pour sa fabrication | [1990/21] | Examination procedure | 19.11.1991 | Examination requested [1992/03] | 09.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 19.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 26.09.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.02.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 09.05.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YPD]JP01097855 ; | [A]JP59109854 ; | [YP]EP0331513 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]); | [A]US4297192 (SHINOHARA HIROSHI, et al); | [A]US4402820 (SANO HIROMI [JP], et al); | [A]US4272349 (FURUTANI TOSHINOBU, et al); | [A]DE2656648 (NIPPON SOKEN) | [YPD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 13, no. 337 (P-906), 28th July 1989; & JP-A-01 097 855 (NGK SPARK PLUG CO., LTD) 17-04-1989, & JP01097855 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 233 (P-309)[1670], 26th October 1984; & JP-A-59 109 854 (MAZDA K.K.) 25-06-1984, & JP59109854 A 00000000 |