EP0367244 - Apparatus for exposing an image of an original film on a photosensitive material in vacuum contact with the original film, and method therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.09.1996 [1996/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dainippon Screen Mfg. Co., Ltd. 1-1, Tenjinkitamachi Teranouchi-Agaru 4-chome Horikawa-Dori Kamikyo-ku Kyoto 602 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/19] | For all designated states Dainippon Screen Mfg. Co., Ltd. 1-1, Tenjinkitamachi Teranouchi-Agaru 4-chome Horikawa-Dori Kamikyo-ku Kyoto 602 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nanri, Seiji c/o Dainippon Screen Mfg. Co., Ltd. Hikone Plant of 480-1 Takamiya-cho Hikone-shi Shiga-ken / JP | 02 /
Ueno, Masatoshi c/o Dainippon Screen Mfg. Co., Ltd Hikone Plant of 480-1 Takamiya-cho Hikone-shi Shiga-ken / JP | 03 /
Ohno, Takashi c/o Dainippon Screen Mfg. Co., Ltd. Hikone Plant of 480-1 Takamiya-cho Hikone-shi Shiga-ken / JP | [1990/19] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/19] | Goddar, Heinz J., Dr., et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89120223.6 | 31.10.1989 | [1990/19] | Priority number, date | JP19880276568 | 31.10.1988 Original published format: JP 27656888 | JP19880160449 | 12.12.1988 Original published format: JP 16044988 | JP19890169263 | 29.06.1989 Original published format: JP 16926389 | [1990/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0367244 | Date: | 09.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0367244 | Date: | 28.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0367244 | Date: | 13.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G03B27/20, G03F7/20 | [1990/19] | CPC: |
G03B27/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/19] | Title | German: | Gerät zur Vakuumkontaktbelichtung eines Originalfilmbildes auf einem photoempfindlichem Material und Verfahren dazu | [1990/19] | English: | Apparatus for exposing an image of an original film on a photosensitive material in vacuum contact with the original film, and method therefor | [1990/19] | French: | Dispositif d'exposition par contact et par le vide d'une image d'un film original sur un matériau photosensible et méthode associée | [1990/19] | Examination procedure | 06.01.1992 | Examination requested [1992/13] | 16.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.03.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4316669 (TACHIKI TATSUO); | [A]US4248531 (SMITH DAVID S); | [A]DE3103739 (DAINIPPON SCREEN MFG [JP]) |