EP0367253 - Exchange system for a yarn-positioning device in winding machines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.08.1994 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.09.1994 [1994/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MASCHINENFABRIK RIETER AG Postfach 290 8406 Winterthur / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1990/19] | For all designated states MASCHINENFABRIK RIETER AG Postfach 290 CH-8406 Winterthur / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Busenhart, Peter Ruchwiesenstrasse 18 CH-8404 Winterthur / CH | 02 /
Mutter, Heinz Anton Graffstrasse 40 CH-8400 Winterthur / CH | [1990/19] | Application number, filing date | 89120244.2 | 02.11.1989 | [1990/19] | Priority number, date | CH19880004104 | 04.11.1988 Original published format: CH 410488 | CH19890001370 | 11.04.1989 Original published format: CH 137089 | [1990/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0367253 | Date: | 09.05.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0367253 | Date: | 06.10.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B65H67/048, B65H65/00 | [1990/19] | CPC: |
B65H54/346 (EP,US);
B65H65/00 (EP,US);
B65H67/048 (EP,US);
B65H2701/31 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1990/19] | Title | German: | Wechselsystem für eine Fadenpositionierung bei Spulern | [1990/19] | English: | Exchange system for a yarn-positioning device in winding machines | [1990/19] | French: | Système d'échange pour un dispositif de mise en place d'un fil dans une machine à bobiner | [1990/19] | Examination procedure | 31.05.1990 | Examination requested [1990/30] | 21.01.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 26.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 30.07.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 30.07.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/39] | Request for further processing for: | 30.07.1993 | Request for further processing filed | 30.07.1993 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.08.1993 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2015046 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [A]US4210293 (FROMAGET GEORGES [FR]); | [A]EP0211748 (SAINT GOBAIN VETROTEX [FR]) |