EP0371283 - Stabilizing packaged iodophor and minimizing leaching of iodine through packaging [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.03.1996 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 11.06.2008 [2008/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Euro-Celtique S.A. 122 Boulevard de la Petrusse Luxemburg / LU | [1990/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bhagwat, Dileep 1817 Carhart Avenue Peekskill, New York 10566 / US | 02 /
INY, Oliver 246-03 Cullmann Avenue Little Neck New York 11362 / US | 03 /
Pedi, Frank Jr. 2773 Hyatt Street Yorktown Heights, New York 10598 / US | [1990/23] | Representative(s) | Maiwald, Walter, et al Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/31] | Maiwald, Walter, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Maiwald & Partner, Poccistrasse 11 D-80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/19] | Strasse, Vonnemann & Partner Balanstrasse 55 D-81541 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/06] | Strasse, Vonnemann & Partner Balanstrasse 55 D-81541 München / DE | ||
Former [1992/48] | Strasse, Vonnemann & Partner Balanstrasse 55 D-81541 München / DE | ||
Former [1992/44] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1990/23] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Martinistrasse 24 D-28195 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 89120456.2 | 06.11.1989 | [1990/23] | Priority number, date | US19880278197 | 30.11.1988 Original published format: US 278197 | [1990/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0371283 | Date: | 06.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0371283 | Date: | 27.12.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0371283 | Date: | 24.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A01N59/12 | [1990/23] | CPC: |
A01N59/12 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1345 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1397 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A01N59/12, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N59/12, A01N25/34, A01N25/22 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1990/23] | Title | German: | Stabilisierung von verpacktem Jodophor und Verringerung des Jodverlusts durch die Verpackung | [1990/23] | English: | Stabilizing packaged iodophor and minimizing leaching of iodine through packaging | [1990/23] | French: | Stabilisation d'iophore emballé et minimalisation de la perte d'iode à travers l'emballage | [1990/23] | Examination procedure | 13.06.1992 | Examination requested [1992/34] | 09.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.04.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 10.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.11.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1992 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   22.12.1992 | 30.11.1993 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   03.02.1994 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 24.05.1995 | [2008/24] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP59088404 ; | [X]US3028300 (ABRAHAM CANTOR, et al); | [X]US3177114 (ABRAHAM CANTOR, et al); | [A]US3950261 (LANDI HENRY PATRICK, et al); | [A]US4384960 (POLLEY RICHARD D [US]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 8, no. 199 (C-242)(1636) 12 September 1984 & JP-A-59 088 404 ( SANYO KASEI KOGYO KK ) 22 May 1984, & JP59088404 A 19840522 |