EP0373350 - Construction element for use as a heating resistance and temperature control device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.10.1992 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INTER CONTROL Hermann Köhler Elektrik GmbH u. Co. KG Schafhofstrasse 30 D-90411 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/25] | For all designated states INTER CONTROL Hermann Köhler Elektrik GmbH u. Co. KG Schafhofstrasse 30 D-90411 Nürnberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hollweck, Walter, Ing. Laufer Weg 38 D-8501 Heroldsberg / DE | [1990/25] | Representative(s) | Hafner, Dieter Patentanwaltskanzlei Dr. D. Hafner Schleiermacherstrasse 25 90491 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Hafner, Dieter Patentanwaltskanzlei Dr. D. Hafner Schleiermacherstrasse 25 90491 Nürnberg / DE | ||
Former [1990/25] | Hafner, Dieter, Dr.rer.nat., Dipl.-Phys. Dr.Hafner & Stippl, Patentanwälte, Ostendstrasse 132 D-90482 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 89120538.7 | 07.11.1989 | [1990/25] | Priority number, date | DE19880015423U | 12.12.1988 Original published format: DE 8815423 U | DE19890006375U | 23.05.1989 Original published format: DE 8906375 U | [1990/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0373350 | Date: | 20.06.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0373350 | Date: | 05.02.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H05B3/26, H05B1/02, H01H1/50 | [1992/06] | CPC: |
A47J27/004 (EP);
A47J31/505 (EP);
A47J31/542 (EP);
H01H1/504 (EP);
H01H37/14 (EP);
H05B3/26 (EP,US);
H05B2203/011 (EP);
H05B2203/013 (EP);
H05B2203/017 (EP);
H05B2203/028 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1990/25] | H05B3/26, H05B1/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/25] | Title | German: | Bauteil, insbesondere für den Einsatz als Heizwiderstand sowie Temperaturregelvorrichtung | [1990/25] | English: | Construction element for use as a heating resistance and temperature control device | [1990/25] | French: | Elément de construction pour l'emploi comme résistance chauffante et dispositif de régulation de la température | [1990/25] | File destroyed: | 15.02.2000 | Examination procedure | 03.12.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/48] | 26.06.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1992/48] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.12.1991 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0284916 (HOFSASS P); | [X]EP0188695 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]US3248501 (JOHN HIRE CHARLES) |