EP0374453 - Steering wheel lock [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.1993 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.12.1993 [1993/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WINNER INTERNATIONAL 32 West State Street Sharon Pennsylvania 16146 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/26] | For all designated states WINNER INTERNATIONAL 32 West State Street Sharon Pennsylvania 16146 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wu, Jinn Fu No. 127 Hai Huan Street Tainan / TW | [1990/26] | Representative(s) | Hennicke, Albrecht, et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Buschhoff Dipl.-Ing. Hennicke Dipl.-Ing. Vollbach Postfach 19 04 08 50501 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/26] | Hennicke, Albrecht, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Buschhoff Dipl.-Ing. Hennicke Dipl.-Ing. Vollbach Postfach 19 04 08 D-50501 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 89120655.9 | 08.11.1989 | [1990/26] | Priority number, date | US19880287105 | 20.12.1988 Original published format: US 287105 | [1990/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0374453 | Date: | 27.06.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0374453 | Date: | 28.11.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0374453 | Date: | 30.12.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B60R25/02 | [1990/26] | CPC: |
B60R25/0225 (EP,US);
B60R25/02 (KR);
B60R25/021 (KR);
B60R25/022 (KR);
Y10T70/5765 (EP,US);
Y10T70/5841 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/26] | Title | German: | Lenkradverriegelung | [1990/26] | English: | Steering wheel lock | [1990/26] | French: | Verrouillage pour volant de direction | [1990/26] | Examination procedure | 08.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/26] | 20.07.1990 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 17.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 17.04.1991 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 13.08.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.06.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 19.08.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.10.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 20.11.1989 | ES   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]AU586805 ; | [AD]US3462982 (MOORE WILLIAM A); | [A]GB1467816 (ZAIDENER K); | [Y]FR2566348 (GRIMALDI CARL [FR]); | [YD]US4738127 (JOHNSON CHARLES R [US]); | [E]DE9001288U |