EP0368273 - New method of assay for antigen [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.03.1995 [1995/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ishikawa, Eiji 24-1, Ohtsukadainishi 3-chome Miyazaki-shi Miyazaki 880-21 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/20] | For all designated states Ishikawa, Eiji 24-1, Ohtsukadainishi 3-chome Miyazaki-shi Miyazaki 880-21 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1990/20] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/20] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 89120687.2 | 08.11.1989 | [1990/20] | Priority number, date | JP19880284925 | 10.11.1988 Original published format: JP 28492588 | [1990/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0368273 | Date: | 16.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0368273 | Date: | 14.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0368273 | Date: | 30.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/543 | [1990/20] | CPC: |
G01N33/543 (EP,US);
Y10S436/822 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1990/20] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Bestimmung eines Antigens | [1990/20] | English: | New method of assay for antigen | [1990/20] | French: | Méthode pour essayer un antigène | [1990/20] | Examination procedure | 19.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/08] | 11.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.10.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.12.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 30.12.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4020151 (BOLZ GUNNER, et al); | [A]EP0196787 (UNIV BOSTON [US], et al); | [A]WO8701459 (WOLTER HERMANN J [DE]) | Examination | EP0236606 | EP0303229 |