EP0368327 - Light-sensitive composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.1996 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.02.1996 [1996/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. No. 210, Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/20] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. No. 210, Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Imai, Masanori c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. 4000, Kawashiri Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun Shizuoka-ken / JP | 02 /
Watanabe, Noriaki c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. 4000, Kawashiri Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun Shizuoka-ken / JP | 03 /
Kawamura, Kouichi c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. 4000, Kawashiri Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun Shizuoka-ken / JP | [1990/20] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/20] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89120820.9 | 09.11.1989 | [1990/20] | Priority number, date | JP19880285404 | 11.11.1988 Original published format: JP 28540488 | JP19880287115 | 14.11.1988 Original published format: JP 28711588 | JP19890093647 | 13.04.1989 Original published format: JP 9364789 | [1990/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0368327 | Date: | 16.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0368327 | Date: | 06.02.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0368327 | Date: | 15.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/038 | [1990/20] | CPC: |
G03F7/0388 (EP,US);
Y10S430/121 (EP,US);
Y10S430/127 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1990/20] | Title | German: | Lichtempfindliche Zusammensetzung | [1990/20] | English: | Light-sensitive composition | [1990/20] | French: | Composition photosensible | [1990/20] | Examination procedure | 18.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/07] | 03.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.12.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.08.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]EP0333156 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]); | [AD]DE3719355 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0021019 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]); | [A]DE1950785 (EASTMAN KODAK CO) |