EP0373363 - Filling of vias in a metallic plane [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.12.1991 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.12.1991 | Change - withdrawal | published on 29.01.1992 [1992/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/25] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lazzarini, Donald Joseph 909 Murray Hill Road Binghamton New York 13903 / US | 02 /
Samuelson, Carl Edwin 2117 Farm-To-Market Road Johnson City New York 13790 / US | 03 /
Wiley, Robert Taylor 14 Lincoln Avenue Endicott New York 13760 / US | [1990/25] | Representative(s) | Klocke, Peter IBM Deutschland Management & Business Support GmbH Patentwesen u. Urheberrecht 71137 Ehningen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/25] | Klocke, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH Patentwesen und Urheberrecht Pascalstrasse 100 D-70569 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 89120835.7 | 10.11.1989 | [1990/25] | Priority number, date | US19880284532 | 15.12.1988 Original published format: US 284532 | [1990/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0373363 | Date: | 20.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0373363 | Date: | 11.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H05K3/00, B29C67/18, B29C43/18, H05K3/44, H05K1/05, B32B15/08 | [1991/35] | CPC: |
B29C37/0085 (EP);
B29C70/088 (EP);
H05K3/445 (EP);
H05K3/4641 (EP);
H05K1/0366 (EP);
H05K2201/09309 (EP);
H05K2203/0191 (EP);
H05K2203/0278 (EP);
H05K2203/068 (EP);
H05K2203/143 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1990/25] | H05K3/00, B29C67/18, B29C43/18 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/25] | Title | German: | Füllen von Löchern in einer metallischen Folie | [1990/25] | English: | Filling of vias in a metallic plane | [1990/25] | French: | Remplissage de trous dans un plan métallique | [1990/25] | File destroyed: | 12.03.1999 | Examination procedure | 25.10.1990 | Examination requested [1990/51] | 03.12.1991 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1992/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0244699 ; | [X]EP0059434 ; | [A]DE2453788 ; | [A]DE3027336 | [XP] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 32, no. 3A, August 1989, pages 122-124, Armonk, NYUS; "Improved processes and materials for filling low dielectric power cores" |