EP0368339 - Pharmaceutical preparation for percutaneous administration containing bunazosin or its salt [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.1994 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.06.1994 [1994/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eisai Co., Ltd. 6-10, Koishikawa 4-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo / JP | For all designated states Sansho Co., Ltd. 13-24, Funado 4-chome Itabashi-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/20] | For all designated states Eisai Co., Ltd. 6-10, Koishikawa 4-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states Sansho Co., Ltd. 13-24, Funado 4-chome Itabashi-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoshida, Mitsuhiro 201, 2924-3, Uenodai Fukaya-shi Saitama / JP | 02 /
Fujimori, Hiroyuki 1034-1, Imai Honjou-shi Saitama / JP | 03 /
Asakawa, Hidenori 1034-1, Imai Honjou-shi Saitama / JP | 04 /
Kasai, Masayoshi 5-156, Tsutsujigaoka Kakamigahara-shi Gifu / JP | 05 /
Kayano, Masanori 9-20, Idogi 1-chome Ageo-shi Saitama / JP | 06 /
Osawa, Shigemitsu 2286-12, Suehirocho Honjou-shi Saitama / JP | [1990/20] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/20] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr.rer.nat., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89120888.6 | 10.11.1989 | [1990/20] | Priority number, date | JP19880285428 | 11.11.1988 Original published format: JP 28542888 | [1990/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0368339 | Date: | 16.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0368339 | Date: | 19.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0368339 | Date: | 23.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/505, A61K47/14 | [1990/20] | CPC: |
A61K31/55 (EP,US);
A61K47/14 (EP,US);
A61K9/0014 (EP,US);
A61P9/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/20] | Title | German: | Bunazosin oder seine Salze enthaltende pharmazeutische Zubereitungen zur perkutanen Verabreichung | [1990/20] | English: | Pharmaceutical preparation for percutaneous administration containing bunazosin or its salt | [1990/20] | French: | Compositions pharmaceutiques contenant la bunazosine ou ses sels pour l'administration percutanée | [1990/20] | Examination procedure | 22.01.1991 | Examination requested [1991/12] | 09.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.12.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1992 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   31.03.1993 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]JP63301822 ; | [A]EP0254978 (EISAI CO LTD [JP]) | [A] - J. PHARM. PHARMCAOL., vol. 39, 1987, pages 399-400, J. PHARM. PHARMACOL.; A. KATO et al.: "Effect of egg yolk lecithin on transdermal delivery of bunazosin hydrochloride" | [AP] - STN INTERNATIONAL INFORMATION SERVICES SATA BASE: CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 111, no. 12, abstract no. 102753a, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-63 301 822 (EISAI CO., LTD) 08-12-1988, & JP63301822 A 00000000 |