EP0428765 - Method and device for frequency modulation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.08.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.10.1997 [1997/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsche ITT Industries GmbH Hans-Bunte-Strasse 19 79108 Freiburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/11] | For all designated states Deutsche ITT Industries GmbH Hans-Bunte-Strasse 19 D-79108 Freiburg / DE | ||
Former [1991/22] | For all designated states DEUTSCHE ITT INDUSTRIES GMBH Hans-Bunte-Strasse 19 D-79108 Freiburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Winterer, Martin, Dipl.-Phys. Bundesstrasse 106 D-7803 Gundelfingen / DE | [1991/22] | Application number, filing date | 89121402.5 | 18.11.1989 | [1991/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0428765 | Date: | 29.05.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0428765 | Date: | 23.10.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H03C3/00, H04N5/92 | [1991/22] | CPC: |
H03C3/00 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, NL [1991/30] |
Former [1991/22] | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Frequenzmodulation | [1991/22] | English: | Method and device for frequency modulation | [1991/22] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de modulation en fréquence | [1991/22] | Examination procedure | 19.11.1990 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.01.1991 | Examination requested [1991/22] | 05.03.1991 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) GB, IT | 04.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.04.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.01.1991 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.1991 | IT   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3654450 (WEBB JOSEPH A); | [A]US3868599 (HIRASAKI TAKASHI, et al); | [A]EP0068535 (PHILIPS PATENTVERWALTUNG [DE], et al); | [A]US4802016 (KANEKO SHINJI [JP]) | Examination | - E.STADLER, "Modulationsverfahren", Kamprath-Reihe.Technik, 3.Auflage, 1983, Seiten 95-97 und 101, Vogel-Buchverlag, Würzburg, DE |