EP0370434 - Cooling system for a V-type engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.1994 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.01.1995 [1995/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/22] | For all designated states Mazda Motor Corporation No. 3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nanba, Seiji 68-10, Yonagigaoka Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima / JP | [1990/22] | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/22] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 D-80797 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89121454.6 | 20.11.1989 | [1990/22] | Priority number, date | JP19880294381 | 21.11.1988 Original published format: JP 29438188 | [1990/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0370434 | Date: | 30.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0370434 | Date: | 11.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0370434 | Date: | 02.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F01P3/02, F01P5/10, F02B75/22, F01P3/20, B60K5/04 | [1990/27] | CPC: |
F01P5/10 (EP,US);
F01P3/02 (EP,KR,US);
F02B75/22 (EP,US);
F02B2075/1824 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1990/22] | F01P3/02, F01P5/10, F02B75/22 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/22] | Title | German: | Kühlungsanlage für V-Brennkraftmaschine | [1990/22] | English: | Cooling system for a V-type engine | [1990/22] | French: | Système de refroidissement pour un moteur à combustion interne à cylindres disposés en V | [1990/22] | Examination procedure | 10.07.1990 | Examination requested [1990/36] | 27.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.08.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.06.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 23.09.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0219351 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0125531 (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]); | [A]DE3527666 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG); | [A]FR2478551 (SUEDDEUTSCHE KUEHLER BEHR [DE]) |