EP0370456 - Bearings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.09.1992 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.1992 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.10.1992 [1992/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vandervell Limited Norden Road Maidenhead Berkshire SL6 4BG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/22] | For all designated states Vandervell Limited Norden Road Maidenhead Berkshire SL6 4BG / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Willis, Michael Gordon 11 Regal Court Sudbury Avenue Wembley Middlesex / GB | 02 /
Robbie, Ewan Norman Frank 56 Caldwell Drive Maidenhead Berkshire SL6 3YR / GB | [1990/22] | Representative(s) | Goddard, David John, et al Harrison Goddard Foote LLP 4th Floor, Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/22] | Goddard, David John, et al Bowdon House Ashburton Road West Trafford Park Manchester M17 1RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 89121508.9 | 21.11.1989 | [1990/22] | Priority number, date | GB19880027606 | 25.11.1988 Original published format: GB 8827606 | [1990/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0370456 | Date: | 30.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0370456 | Date: | 02.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F16C17/10 | [1990/22] | CPC: |
F16C43/02 (EP,US);
F16C17/10 (EP,US);
F16C2226/76 (EP,US);
F16C2360/22 (EP,US);
F16C9/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [1990/22] | Title | German: | Lager | [1990/22] | English: | Bearings | [1990/22] | French: | Paliers | [1990/22] | File destroyed: | 16.02.2000 | Examination procedure | 07.09.1990 | Examination requested [1990/44] | 28.08.1992 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1992/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3795428 (PAINE J, et al); | [YD]GB1386253 (VANDERVELL PRODUCTS LTD); | [Y]DE2638996 (KLOECKNER HUMBOLDT DEUTZ AG); | [A]FR2360788 (GLYCO METALL WERKE [DE]); | [A]WO8600379 (FEDERAL MOGUL CORP [US]) |