EP0375959 - Method of controlling data transfer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.01.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.03.1999 [1999/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/10] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 33-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1990/33] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1990/27] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-01 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jippo, Akira c/o NEC Corporation 33-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [1990/27] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/27] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89121900.8 | 28.11.1989 | [1990/27] | Priority number, date | JP19880299423 | 29.11.1988 Original published format: JP 29942388 | [1990/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0375959 | Date: | 04.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0375959 | Date: | 26.02.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0375959 | Date: | 11.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G06F5/06 | [1990/27] | CPC: |
G06F5/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1990/27] | Title | German: | Datenübertragungssteuerungsverfahren | [1990/27] | English: | Method of controlling data transfer | [1990/27] | French: | Procédé de commande de transfert de données | [1990/27] | Examination procedure | 20.12.1989 | Examination requested [1990/27] | 03.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 04.08.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 08.08.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 11.11.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.12.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2037039 (HONEYWELL INF SYSTEMS); | [A]US3980993 (BREDART GUY, et al); | [A]FR2545636 (ELSCINT LTD [IL]) | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN. vol. 29, no. 4, September 1986, NEW YORK US pages 1829 - 1833; ANONYMOUS: 'Data rate matching buffer' | [A] - ELECTRO. vol. 12, no. 4, 1987, LOS ANGELES US pages 1 - 8; SELTZER ET AL: 'No-fall-through fifo solves high-speed applications' | Examination | EP0141742 |