EP0372438 - UV and plasma stable high-reflectance multilayer dielectric mirror [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.07.1991 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONEYWELL INC. Honeywell Plaza Minneapolis, MN 55408 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/24] | For all designated states HONEYWELL INC. Honeywell Plaza Minneapolis Minnesota 55408 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cole, Barrett E. 3010 W. 12th Street Bloomington Minnesota 55344 / US | [1990/24] | Representative(s) | Rentzsch, Heinz, et al Honeywell Holding AG Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Postfach 10 08 65 63008 Offenbach / DE | [2009/29] |
Former [1990/24] | Rentzsch, Heinz, Dipl.-Ing., et al Honeywell Holding AG Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Kaiserleistrasse 39 Postfach 10 08 65 D-63008 Offenbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 89122262.2 | 02.12.1989 | [1990/24] | Priority number, date | US19880280043 | 05.12.1988 Original published format: US 280043 | [1990/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0372438 | Date: | 13.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0372438 | Date: | 01.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/08, G02B1/10 | [1990/24] | CPC: |
G02B5/26 (EP);
G02B5/0833 (EP);
G02B5/0891 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/24] | Title | German: | UV- und plasmastabiler vielschichtiger, hochreflektierender dielektrischer Spiegel | [1990/24] | English: | UV and plasma stable high-reflectance multilayer dielectric mirror | [1990/24] | French: | Miroir multicouche diélectrique à haut pouvoir de réflexion résistant aux rayons UV et au plasma | [1990/24] | File destroyed: | 08.03.1999 | Examination procedure | 02.02.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/38] | 19.04.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1991/38] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3731501 ; | [A]FR2158017 | [A] - NUCLEAR INSTRUMENTS & METHODS IN PHYSICS RESEARCH, vol. A250, no. 1/2, September 1986, pages 289-292, Elsevier Science Publishers B.V. (North-Holland Physics Publishing Division)NL; M. AMBROSIO et al.: "Preliminary results on dielectric mirror damage due to the radiation of a high K undulator" | [A] - NUCLEAR INSTRUMENTS & METHODS IN PHYSICS RESEARCH/SECTION B24/25, part 1, 3rd April 1987, pages 603-607, Elsevier Science Publishers B.V. (North-Holland Physics Publishing Division), AmsterdamNL; J.G. BEERY: "Ion beam characterization of laser mirrors" | [A] - THIN SOLID FILMS, vol. 129, no. 3/4, July 1985, pages L71-L73, Elsevier Sequioa, LausanneCH; K.V.S.R. APPARAO et al.: "Low loss ZrO2 films for optical applications in the UV region" |