EP0380784 - Method and apparatus for inserting a green tire in a vulcanizing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.04.1995 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.05.1995 [1995/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | For all designated states SUMITOMO RUBBER INDUSTRIES LIMITED 1-1 Tsutsui-cho 1-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/43] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states SUMITOMO RUBBER INDUSTRIES LIMITED 1-1 Tsutsuicho 1-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | |||
Former [1990/42] | For all designated states SUMITOMO RUBBER INDUSTRIES, LTD. No. 1-1, Tsutsui-cho 1-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken 651 / JP | ||
For all designated states SUMITOMO RUBBER INDUSTRIES LIMITED 1-1 Tsutsuicho 1-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | |||
Former [1990/32] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states SUMITOMO RUBBER INDUSTRIES LIMITED 1-1 Tsutsuicho 1-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Katayama, Hideaki Nagasaki Shipyard &Engine Works of Mitsubishi Jukogyo K.K. 1-1, Akunoura-machi Nagasaki-shi Nagasaki-ken / JP | 02 /
Murakami, Toshifumi Nagasaki Shipyard &Eng. Works of Mitsubishi Jukogyo K.K. 1-1, Akunoura-machi Nagasaki-shi Nagasaki-ken / JP | 03 /
Hasegawa, Akira Nagasaki Shipyard &Eng. Works of Mitsubishi Jukogyo K.K. 1-1, Akunoura-machi Nagasaki-shi Nagasaki-ken / JP | 04 /
Sakaguchi, Katsuyoshi Nagasaki Shipyard &Eng.Works of Mitsubishi Jukogyo K.K. 1-1, Akunoura-machi Nagasaki-shi Nagasaki-ken / JP | 05 /
Soeda, Koji 5-9-6, Motoyamakita-machi, Higashinada-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | 06 /
Kubota, Yoshiya 21-23, Shimobando Shiga-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken / JP | 07 /
Kubota, Akinori 1-1-2, Ryugadai Suma-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | 08 /
Ijiri, Masaaki Oshikusa-Danchi 408-407 4-2-1, Shiratori Togo-cho Aichi-gun Aichi-ken / JP | [1990/42] |
Former [1990/32] | 01 /
Katayama, Hideaki Nagasaki Shipyrd & Engine Works of Mitsubishi Jukogyo K.K. 1-1, Akunoura-machi Nagasaki-shi Nagasaki-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Murakami, Toshifumi Nagasaki Shipyrd & Eng. Works of Mitsubishi Jukogyo K.K. 1-1, Akunoura-machi Nagasaki-shi Nagasaki-ken / JP | |||
03 /
Hasegawa, Akira Nagasaki Shipyrd & Eng. Works of Mitsubishi Jukogyo K.K. 1-1, Akunoura-machi Nagasaki-shi Nagasaki-ken / JP | |||
04 /
Sakaguchi, Katsuyoshi Nagasaki Shipyrd & Eng.Works of Mitsubishi Jukogyo K.K. 1-1, Akunoura-machi Nagasaki-shi Nagasaki-ken / JP | |||
05 /
Soeda, Koji 5-9-6, Motoyamakita-machi, Higashinada-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | |||
06 /
Kubota, Yoshiya 21-23, Shimobando Shiga-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken / JP | |||
07 /
Kubota, Akinori 1-1-2, Ryugadai Suma-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | |||
08 /
Ijiri, Masaaki Oshikusa-Danchi 408-407 4-2-1, Shiratori Togo-cho Aichi-gun Aichi-ken / JP | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/32] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel & Partner Möhlstrasse 37 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89122461.0 | 06.12.1989 | [1990/32] | Priority number, date | JP19890019869 | 31.01.1989 Original published format: JP 1986989 | [1990/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0380784 | Date: | 08.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0380784 | Date: | 07.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/32] | Type: | A1 / A2 RE Reissue of A-publication | No.: | EP0380784 | Date: | 14.11.1991 | [1992/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0380784 | Date: | 08.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B29D30/06 | [1990/32] | CPC: |
B29D30/0601 (EP,US);
B29D30/26 (KR);
B29D30/06 (KR);
B29D30/0603 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1990/32] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Einsetzen eines Reifens in eine Vulkanisiermaschine | [1990/32] | English: | Method and apparatus for inserting a green tire in a vulcanizing machine | [1990/32] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour insérer un pneu cru dans une machine à vulcaniser | [1990/32] | Examination procedure | 03.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/32] | 20.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.05.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.12.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 07.03.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2329435 (ZELANT GAZUIT [FR]); | [A]GB1177617 (PIRELLI [IT]); | [A]FR2176503 (GAZUIT GEORGES [FR]); | [A]US4236883 (TURK LEONARD G, et al) |