EP0372579 - High-performance computer system with fault-tolerant capability; method for operating such a system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1990/24] | High-performance computer system with fault-tolerant capability | ||
[1997/40] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.08.1998 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TANDEM COMPUTERS INCORPORATED 10435 N. Tantau Avenue Cupertino California 95014-0709 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/24] | For all designated states TANDEM COMPUTERS INCORPORATED 10435 N. Tantau Avenue Cupertino, California 95014-0709 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cutts, Richard W., Jr. 1312 Elm Street Georgetown Texas 78626 / US | 02 /
Banton, Randall G. 1805 Stoneridge Road Austin Texas 78746 / US | 03 /
Jewett, Douglas E. 12401 Wycliff Lane Austin Texas 78727 / US | 04 /
Norwood, Peter C. 2200 Klattenhoff Drive Austin Texas 78728 / US | 05 /
Debacker, Kenneth C. 15702 Monona Cove Austin Texas 78717 / US | 06 /
Mehta, Nikhil A. 1715 Prairie Hen Cove Austin Texas 78758 / US | 07 /
Allison, John David 1406 Windsor Road, Nr. 202 Austin Texas 78703 / US | 08 /
Horst, Robert W. 2804 Robeson Park Drive Champaign Illinois 61821 / US | [1990/24] | Representative(s) | Altenburg, Udo, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Altenburg, Udo, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [1990/24] | Altenburg, Udo, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Frohwitter . Geissler & Partner, Galileiplatz 1 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89122708.4 | 08.12.1989 | [1990/24] | Priority number, date | US19880282629 | 09.12.1988 Original published format: US 282629 | US19880283574 | 13.12.1988 Original published format: US 283574 | [1990/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0372579 | Date: | 13.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0372579 | Date: | 24.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0372579 | Date: | 01.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/16, G06F11/18 | [1991/32] | CPC: |
G06F9/3863 (EP,US);
G06F11/0724 (EP,US);
G06F11/1641 (EP,US);
G06F11/1658 (EP,US);
G06F11/1666 (EP,US);
G06F11/1683 (EP,US);
G06F11/1687 (EP,US);
G06F11/1691 (EP,US);
G06F11/18 (EP,US);
G06F11/184 (EP,US);
G06F11/185 (EP,US);
G06F11/2017 (EP,US);
G06F9/3824 (EP,US);
G06F9/3851 (EP,US);
G06F9/3885 (EP,US);
G06F11/0757 (EP,US);
G06F11/1008 (EP,US);
G06F11/1405 (EP,US);
G06F11/1415 (EP,US);
G06F11/1679 (EP,US);
G06F11/181 (EP,US);
G06F11/182 (EP,US);
G06F11/20 (EP,US);
G06F11/2015 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1990/24] | G06F11/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1990/24] | Title | German: | Hochleistungsrechnersystem mit fehlertoleranter Fähigkeit; Verfahren zum Betrieb desselben | [1997/40] | English: | High-performance computer system with fault-tolerant capability; method for operating such a system | [1997/40] | French: | Système de calculateur à haute performance à capacité de tolèrance de fautes; méthode pour operer un tel système | [1997/40] |
Former [1990/24] | Hochleistungsrechnersystem mit fehlertoleranter Fähigkeit | ||
Former [1990/24] | High-performance computer system with fault-tolerant capability | ||
Former [1990/24] | Système de calculateur à haute performance à capacité de tolèrance de fautes | Miscellaneous | EPB 1997/40: (deleted) | EPB 1997/40: (deleted) | EPB 1997/40: (deleted) | EPB 1995/38: Teilanmeldung 95111006.3 eingereicht am 13/07/95 | EPB 1995/38: Divisional application 95111006.3 filed on 13/07/95 | EPB 1995/38: Demande divisionnaire 95111006.3 déposée le 13/07/95 | Examination procedure | 07.08.1991 | Examination requested [1991/41] | 07.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 12.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 21.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.04.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP95111006.3 / EP0681239 | Opposition(s) | 02.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3921149 (KREIS WERNER, et al); | [Y]US4703452 (ABRANT ROBERT J [US], et al); | [Y]EP0286856 | [A] - THE 12TH ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON COMPUTER ARCHITECTURE, CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS, Boston, MA, 17th - 19th June 1985, pages 215-220; D. NAEDEL: "Closely coupled asynchronous hierarchical and parallel processing in an open architecture" |