EP0377831 - Process for the preparation of surface-active alkyl glucosides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.04.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.04.1992 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.06.1992 [1992/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/29] | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hill, Karlheinz, Dr. Am Hasenbusch 1 D-4006 Erkrath / DE | 02 /
Biermann, Manfred, Dr. Markscheiderhof 25 D-4330 Mülheim / DE | [1990/29] | Application number, filing date | 89122750.6 | 09.12.1989 | [1990/29] | Priority number, date | DE19883842541 | 17.12.1988 Original published format: DE 3842541 | [1990/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0377831 | Date: | 18.07.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C07H15/04 | [1990/29] | CPC: |
C07H15/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | GR [1990/29] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von oberflächenaktiven Alkylglucosiden | [1990/29] | English: | Process for the preparation of surface-active alkyl glucosides | [1990/29] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'alkylglucosides tensioactifs | [1990/29] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 13.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/06] | 25.03.1991 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1992/25] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]EP0092875 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]); | [X]DE1905523 (ATLAS CHEM IND); | [X]FR1411864 (ROHM & HAAS); | [A]FR2017240 (ROHM & HAAS) |