EP0374665 - Assay of sequences using amplified genes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.06.1993 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.1993 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.08.1993 [1993/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MILES INC. One Mellon Center 500 Grant St. Pittsburgh, PA 15219-2502 / US | [1992/23] |
Former [1990/26] | For all designated states MOLECULAR DIAGNOSTICS, INC. 400 Morgan Lane West Haven, CT 06516 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dattagupta, Nanibhushan 470 Prospect Street New Haven, CT 06511 / US | [1990/26] | Representative(s) | Dänner, Klaus, et al Bayer AG Konzernbereich RP Rechtspolitik Gewerblicher Rechtsschutz 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/09] | Dänner, Klaus, Dr., et al Bayer AG Konzernverwaltung RP Patente Konzern D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | ||
Former [1990/26] | Dänner, Klaus, Dr. c/o Bayer AG Konzernverwaltung RP Patente Konzern D-5090 Leverkusen 1 Bayerwerk / DE | Application number, filing date | 89122786.0 | 09.12.1989 | [1990/26] | Priority number, date | US19880289638 | 23.12.1988 Original published format: US 289638 | [1990/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0374665 | Date: | 27.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0374665 | Date: | 20.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [1990/26] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6813 (EP);
C12Q1/686 (EP);
C12Q1/6876 (EP);
C12Q1/689 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/26] | Title | German: | Prüfung von Sequenzen mittels amplifizierter Gene | [1990/26] | English: | Assay of sequences using amplified genes | [1990/26] | French: | Essai des séquences utilisant des gènes amplifiés | [1990/26] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 09.12.1989 | Examination requested [1990/26] | 16.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2202328 ; | [Y]EP0184056 ; | [XP]EP0297379 ; | [E]EP0370694 ; | [XP]WO8911546 ; | [E]EP0357011 |