EP0374675 - Reduction of piperidine-dion-derivatives and intermediates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.06.1991 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.1991 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.08.1991 [1991/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NOVO NORDISK A/S Novo Allé 2880 Bagsværd / DK | [N/P] |
Former [1991/17] | For all designated states NOVO NORDISK A/S Novo Allé DK-2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | ||
Former [1990/26] | For all designated states A/S FERROSAN Sydmarken 5 DK-2860 Soeborg / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lundbeck, Jane Marie Evas Allé 19 DK-2600 Glostrup / DK | 02 /
Treppendahl, Svend Frederiksdalsvej 221 DK-2830 Virum / DK | 03 /
Jakobsen, Palle Langkaer Vaene 14 DK-3500 Vaerlose / DK | [1990/26] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/26] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89122827.2 | 11.12.1989 | [1990/26] | Priority number, date | DK19880007160 | 22.12.1988 Original published format: DK 716088 | [1990/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0374675 | Date: | 27.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/26] | Classification | IPC: | C07D211/90, C07D211/20, A61K31/445 | [1990/26] | CPC: |
C07D405/04 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
C07D211/22 (EP);
C07D211/24 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/26] | Title | German: | Reduktion von Piperidindion-Derivaten und Zwischenprodukte | [1990/26] | English: | Reduction of piperidine-dion-derivatives and intermediates | [1990/26] | French: | Réduction de dérivés de pipéridinedione et intermédiaires | [1990/26] | Examination procedure | 10.04.1991 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1991/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |