EP0374715 - Television system with devices for adapting a television picture format generated at the transmitt side and at the receiver side [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.03.1996 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.05.1996 [1996/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GRUNDIG E.M.V. Elektro-Mechanische Versuchsanstalt Max Grundig GmbH & Co. KG Kurgartenstrasse 37 D-90762 Fürth / DE | [1995/27] |
Former [1990/26] | For all designated states GRUNDIG E.M.V. Elektro-Mechanische Versuchsanstalt Max Grundig holländ. Stiftung & Co. KG. Kurgartenstrasse 37 D-90762 Fürth / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kays, Rüdiger, Dr. Ing. GRUNDIG E.M.V. Max Grundig holländ. Stiftung & Co KG Kurgartenstrasse 37 D-8510 Fürth/Bay. / DE | [1990/26] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1996/06] |
Former [1990/26] | Dreykorn-Lindner, Werner, Dipl.-Ing. GRUNDIG E.M.V. Elektro-Mechanische Versuchsanstalt Max Grundig holländ.Stiftung & Co. KG Lizenzen und Patente D-90748 Fürth / DE | Application number, filing date | 89123019.5 | 13.12.1989 | [1990/26] | Priority number, date | DE19883842941 | 21.12.1988 Original published format: DE 3842941 | [1990/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0374715 | Date: | 27.06.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0374715 | Date: | 12.12.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0374715 | Date: | 24.05.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/00 | [1990/26] | CPC: |
H04N7/0122 (EP);
H04N11/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT [1990/26] | Title | German: | Fernsehsystem mit Einrichtungen zur Anpassung von sendeseitig und empfangsseitig erzeugtem Fernsehbildformat | [1990/26] | English: | Television system with devices for adapting a television picture format generated at the transmitt side and at the receiver side | [1990/26] | French: | Système de télévision avec dispositifs d'adaptation du format de l'image de télévision obtenu à l'émetteur et au récepteur | [1990/26] | Examination procedure | 22.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 05.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.11.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO8605644 (SCIENTIFIC ATLANTA [US]); | [A]FR2586332 (RCA CORP [US]); | [A]EP0213911 (RCA CORP [US]) |