EP0377849 - Beverage mixes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.1994 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.04.1994 [1994/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE DES PRODUITS NESTLE S.A. Case postale 353 1800 Vevey / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1990/29] | For all designated states SOCIETE DES PRODUITS NESTLE S.A. Case postale 353 CH-1800 Vevey / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Camp, Wiliam Francis 53 Curtis Street Fulton, N.Y. 13069 / US | 02 /
Fischbach, Eugene R. 12 Riverview Drive Fulton, N.Y. 13069 / US | [1990/29] | Application number, filing date | 89123113.6 | 14.12.1989 | [1990/29] | Priority number, date | US19890295818 | 11.01.1989 Original published format: US 295818 | [1990/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0377849 | Date: | 18.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0377849 | Date: | 14.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A23G1/00, A23F5/40, A23L2/38 | [1990/29] | CPC: |
A23G3/346 (EP,US);
A23F5/40 (EP,US);
A23G1/047 (EP,US);
A23G1/56 (EP,US);
A23G3/40 (EP,US);
A23L2/39 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A23G1/56, A23G2220/20 (EP,US);
A23G3/346, A23G2200/08 (US,EP);
A23G3/346, A23G2200/12 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/29] | Title | German: | Getränkemischungen | [1990/29] | English: | Beverage mixes | [1990/29] | French: | Mélanges pour boisson | [1990/29] | Examination procedure | 14.12.1989 | Examination requested [1990/29] | 19.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.10.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB294790 (AAGE NYROP); | [X]GB1273248 (LUWA AG [CH]); | [A]CH527570 (NESTLE SA [CH]); | [XP]EP0324072 (NESTLE SA [CH]) |