EP0374760 - Dioxane addition compounds of aromatic meta- or para-hydroxy-carboxylic acids, and process for their preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.03.1993 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.05.1993 [1993/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/26] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
von Plessen, Helmold, Dr. Kugelherrnstrasse 16 D-6240 Königstein/Taunus / DE | 02 /
Rittner, Siegbert, Dr. Kornblumenweg 5 D-6082 Mörfelden-Walldorf / DE | [1990/26] | Application number, filing date | 89123247.2 | 15.12.1989 | [1990/26] | Priority number, date | DE19883842712 | 19.12.1988 Original published format: DE 3842712 | [1990/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0374760 | Date: | 27.06.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0374760 | Date: | 13.05.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C07C65/03, C07C65/11, C07C51/43, C07D319/12 | [1990/26] | CPC: |
C07C51/43 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C51/43, C07C65/03 (EP,US);
C07C51/43, C07C65/11 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1990/26] | Title | German: | Dioxan-Addukte aromatischer meta- oder para-Hydroxy-carbonsäuren und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1990/26] | English: | Dioxane addition compounds of aromatic meta- or para-hydroxy-carboxylic acids, and process for their preparation | [1990/26] | French: | Produits d'addition de dioxanne avec des acides méta ou para-hydroxycarboxyliques et leur procédé de préparation | [1992/20] |
Former [1990/26] | Produits d'adduction de dioxanne avec des acides méta ou para-hydroxycarboxyliques et leur procédé de préparation | Examination procedure | 26.10.1990 | Examination requested [1990/52] | 11.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 10.08.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.11.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.02.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP0341594 (HOECHST AG [DE]) | [X] - MIKROCHIM. ACTA, Band 6, 1969, Seiten 1208-1209, Univ. Innsbruck, AU; M. KUHNERT-BRANDSTÄTTER et al.: "Lösungsmitteleinschlüsse in Kristallen von p-substituierten Benzoesäurederivaten" | Examination | EP0325925 |