EP0377160 - Safety document including an electricity conductor safety element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.1995 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.07.1995 [1995/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GAO Gesellschaft für Automation und Organisation mbH Postfach 70 07 03 81307 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/28] | For all designated states GAO Gesellschaft für Automation und Organisation mbH Postfach 70 07 03 D-81307 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kaule, Wittich Lindacher Weg 13 D-8089 Emmering / DE | 02 /
Ilgmann, Wilhelm Kastanienstrasse 26 D-8190 Wolfratshausen / DE | 03 /
Schwenk, Gerhard Primelstrasse 106 D-8039 Puchheim / DE | 04 /
Stenzel, Gerhard Steph.-Lochner-Strasse 21 D-8000 München 21 / DE | [1990/28] | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/28] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 D-80797 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89123286.0 | 15.12.1989 | [1990/28] | Priority number, date | DE19883843075 | 21.12.1988 Original published format: DE 3843075 | [1990/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0377160 | Date: | 11.07.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0377160 | Date: | 03.08.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G07D7/00, D21H21/48 | [1990/28] | CPC: |
G07D7/023 (EP,US);
D21H21/48 (EP,US);
Y10S428/90 (EP,US);
Y10S428/916 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24917 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31678 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/28] | Title | German: | Sicherheitsdokument mit darin eingebettetem elektrisch leitfähigen Sicherheitselement | [1990/28] | English: | Safety document including an electricity conductor safety element | [1990/28] | French: | Document de sécurité comportant un élément de sécurité conducteur de l'électricité | [1990/28] | Examination procedure | 10.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/06] | 12.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.02.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.05.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2754267 (PORTALS LTD); | [A]FR2417401 (INTEGRATED DATA CORP [US]); | [Y]DE2909731 (OESTERR NATIONALBANK) |