EP0397922 - Lubricant pump [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.09.1994 [1994/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pressol Schmiergeräte GmbH Knebelstrasse 1-3 90427 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/47] | For all designated states Pressol Schmiergeräte GmbH Knebelstrasse 1-3 D-90427 Nürnberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Henke, Franz Reiterweg D-8927-Burggen / DE | [1990/47] | Representative(s) | Böhme, Volker Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Patentanwälte Bankgasse 3 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/47] | Böhme, Volker, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. E. Kessel Dipl.Ing. V. Böhme Karolinenstrasse 27 D-90402 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 89123368.6 | 18.12.1989 | [1990/47] | Priority number, date | DE19893916422 | 19.05.1989 Original published format: DE 3916422 | [1990/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0397922 | Date: | 22.11.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0397922 | Date: | 16.01.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0397922 | Date: | 22.09.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F16N13/16, F04B9/12, F01L25/06 | [1991/10] | CPC: |
F16N13/16 (EP,US);
F04B9/125 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1990/47] | F16N13/16, F01L25/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/47] | Title | German: | Schmierstoffpumpe | [1990/47] | English: | Lubricant pump | [1990/47] | French: | Pompe de graissage | [1990/47] | Examination procedure | 06.02.1991 | Examination requested [1991/15] | 02.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 10.08.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1963783 (FOX ALEXANDER P); | [A]US3366066 (LEVEY GUSTAVE S); | [A]US4079660 (IVES FRANK E) |