EP0374826 - Flat objects separator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.05.1993 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.07.1993 [1993/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL BUSINESS SYSTEMS 12, rue de la Baume F-75008 Paris / FR | [1990/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Savalle, Patrick 8, rue du Tertre F-92150 Suresnes / FR | 02 /
Uzan, Simon 3, av. du 8 mai 1945 F-95200 Sarcelles / FR | [1990/26] | Representative(s) | Weinmiller, Jürgen, et al Spott, Weinmiller & Böhm Patentanwälte Sendlinger-Tor-Platz 11 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/26] | Weinmiller, Jürgen, et al Lennéstrasse 9 Postfach 24 D-82336 Feldafing / DE | Application number, filing date | 89123449.4 | 19.12.1989 | [1990/26] | Priority number, date | FR19880016820 | 20.12.1988 Original published format: FR 8816820 | [1990/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0374826 | Date: | 27.06.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B65H3/52, B65H3/06 | [1990/26] | CPC: |
B65H3/5238 (EP);
B65H3/063 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/26] | Title | German: | Entstapler für flache Gegenstände | [1990/26] | English: | Flat objects separator | [1990/26] | French: | Dépileur d'articles plats | [1990/26] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 27.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 02.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/28] | 11.02.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0280210 ; | [A]DE3439844 ; | [A]US4457507 ; | [AD]FR2588537 |