EP0374920 - Developer circulator unit of the images forming apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CASIO COMPUTER COMPANY LIMITED 6-1, 2-chome, Nishi-Shinjuku Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160 / JP | For all designated states CASIO ELECTRONICS MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. 2-229, Sakuragioka Higashiyamato-shi Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/26] | For all designated states CASIO COMPUTER COMPANY LIMITED 6-1, 2-chome, Nishi-Shinjuku Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160 / JP | ||
For all designated states CASIO ELECTRONICS MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. 2-229, Sakuragioka Higashiyamato-shi Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hayashi, Mitsuo Patent Dpt. Dev. Div. Hamura R&D Center Casio Comp. Co. Ltd. 3-2-1, Sakae-cho Hamura-machi Nishitama-gun Tokyo 190-11 / JP | 02 /
Ono, Noriki Patent Dpt. Dev. Div. Hamura R&D Center Casio Comp. Co. Ltd. 3-2-1, Sakae-cho Hamura-machi Nishitama-gun Tokyo 190-11 / JP | 03 /
Yorifuji, Takao Patent Dpt. Dev. Div. Hamura R&D Center Casio Comp. Co. Ltd. 3-2-1, Sakae-cho Hamura-machi Nishitama-gun Tokyo 190-11 / JP | 04 /
Maruyama, Masatoshi Patent Dpt. Dev. Div. Hamura R&D Center Casio Comp. Co. Ltd. 3-2-1, Sakae-cho Hamura-machi Nishitama-gun Tokyo 190-11 / JP | [1990/29] |
Former [1990/26] | 01 /
Hayashi, Mitsui Patent Dpt. Dev. Div. Hamura R&D Center Casio Comp. Co. Ltd. 3-2-1, Sakae-cho Hamura-machi Nishitama-gun Tokyo 190-11 / JP | ||
02 /
Ono, Noriki Patent Dpt. Dev. Div. Hamura R&D Center Casio Comp. Co. Ltd. 3-2-1, Sakae-cho Hamura-machi Nishitama-gun Tokyo 190-11 / JP | |||
03 /
Yorifuji, Takao Patent Dpt. Dev. Div. Hamura R&D Center Casio Comp. Co. Ltd. 3-2-1, Sakae-cho Hamura-machi Nishitama-gun Tokyo 190-11 / JP | |||
04 /
Maruyama, Masatoshi Patent Dpt. Dev. Div. Hamura R&D Center Casio Comp. Co. Ltd. 3-2-1, Sakae-cho Hamura-machi Nishitama-gun Tokyo 190-11 / JP | Representative(s) | Strasse, Joachim Strasse & Hofstetter Balanstrasse 57 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/01] | Strasse, Joachim, Dipl.-Ing. Strasse, Vonnemann & Partner Balanstrasse 55 D-81541 München / DE | ||
Former [1992/45] | Strasse, Joachim, Dipl.-Ing. Strasse & Partner Balanstrasse 55 D-81541 München / DE | ||
Former [1992/40] | Strasse, Joachim, Dipl.-Ing. Strasse, Vonnemann & Partner Balanstrasse 55 D-81541 München / DE | ||
Former [1990/26] | Strasse, Joachim, Dipl.-Ing. Strasse, Vonnemann & Partner Balanstrasse 55 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89123661.4 | 21.12.1989 | [1990/26] | Priority number, date | JP19880166987U | 23.12.1988 Original published format: JP 16698788 U | JP19890002666U | 17.01.1989 Original published format: JP 266689 U | JP19890002667U | 17.01.1989 Original published format: JP 266789 U | JP19890002668U | 17.01.1989 Original published format: JP 266889 U | JP19890026778U | 09.03.1989 Original published format: JP 2677889 U | JP19880328371 | 26.12.1988 Original published format: JP 32837188 | [1990/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0374920 | Date: | 27.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0374920 | Date: | 17.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0374920 | Date: | 01.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/08, G03G21/00, G03G15/00 | [1992/25] | CPC: |
G03G15/0822 (EP,US);
G03G21/105 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1990/26] | G03G15/08, G03G21/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1990/26] | Title | German: | Entwickler-Transporteinheit für ein Bilderzeugungsgerät | [1990/26] | English: | Developer circulator unit of the images forming apparatus | [1990/26] | French: | Unité de transport de développateur pour appareil de formation d'images | [1990/26] | Examination procedure | 28.03.1991 | Examination requested [1991/22] | 09.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.11.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 01.06.1994 | IT | 01.06.1994 | GB | 21.12.1994 | [2006/14] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 01.06.1994 | |
FR | 28.10.1994 | ||
GB | 21.12.1994 | ||
Former [1996/04] | FR | 28.10.1994 | |
GB | 21.12.1994 | ||
Former [1995/24] | FR | 28.10.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP61114273 ; | [A]JP60041079 ; | [AD]EP0249928 (MITA INDUSTRIAL CO LTD [JP]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 298 (P-505)(2354) 9 October 1986 & JP-A-61 114 273 ( TOSHIBA CORP ) 31 May 1986, & JP61114273 A 19860531 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 9, no. 163 (P-371)(1886) 9 July 1985 & JP-A-60 041 079 ( KONISHIROKU SHASHIN KOGYO K.K. ) 4 March 1985, & JP60041079 A 19850304 |