EP0433483 - A rotation device supporting a polygon mirror [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1991/26] | A rotation supporting device of a polygon mirror | ||
[1995/17] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.1996 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.04.1996 [1996/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EBARA CORPORATION 11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/26] | For all designated states EBARA CORPORATION 11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Osada, Noriyuki 1-17-3, Oyamadai Setagaya-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Hisabe, Yasushi 4-15-14-206, Ichinomiya Samukawamachi Koza-gun Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Ohtani, Toshihiro 4-5-3, Sagamihara Sagamihara-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 04 /
Kanamori, Toshiya 1-9-2, Inari Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1991/26] | Representative(s) | Geyer, Ulrich F., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/26] | Geyer, Ulrich F., Dr. Dipl.-Phys., et al WAGNER & GEYER, Patentanwälte, Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89123680.4 | 21.12.1989 | [1991/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0433483 | Date: | 26.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0433483 | Date: | 26.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G02B26/10 | [1991/26] | CPC: |
F16C25/045 (EP,US);
G02B26/121 (EP,US);
G02B7/1821 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1991/26] | Title | German: | Aufbau eines rotierenden Polygonspiegels | [1991/26] | English: | A rotation device supporting a polygon mirror | [1995/17] | French: | Structure d'un miroir polygonal tournant | [1995/17] |
Former [1991/26] | A rotation supporting device of a polygon mirror | ||
Former [1991/26] | Structure d'un miroir polygonal rotant | Examination procedure | 12.12.1991 | Examination requested [1992/08] | 25.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 20.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 27.10.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1992 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   29.06.1993 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP63241515 ; | [A]JP58215602 ; | [A]EP0210835 (KANEGAFUCHI CHEMICAL IND [JP], et al); | [X]EP0229911 (EBARA RES CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]US4726640 (IWAMA AKIHIKO [JP], et al); | [A]DE3733117 (TOSHIBA KAWASAKI KK [JP]); | [X]WO8804787 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]); | [A]US4820005 (HASHIMOTO YOSHIO [JP], et al) | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 47 (P-822)(3395) 03 February 1989, & JP-A-63 241515 (EBARA CORP) 06 October 1988,, & JP63241515 A 19881006 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 8, no. 68 (P-264)(1505) 30 March 1984, & JP-A-58 215602 (FUJITSU K.K.) 15 December 1983,, & JP58215602 A 19831215 | [A] - XEROX DISCLOSURE JOURNAL vol. 6, no. 2, March 1981, pages 89 - 91; M.J.PROFANT: "Adjustable Rotating Light Beam Deflector" |