EP0374939 - Optical connector ferrule and method for assembling the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.1996 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.03.1996 [1996/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/33] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1990/26] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-01 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kurata, Kazuhiko c/o NEC Corporation 33-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [1990/26] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/26] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89123742.2 | 22.12.1989 | [1990/26] | Priority number, date | JP19880323248 | 23.12.1988 Original published format: JP 32324888 | [1990/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0374939 | Date: | 27.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0374939 | Date: | 31.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0374939 | Date: | 05.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/38 | [1990/26] | CPC: |
G02B6/3861 (EP,US);
G02B6/3835 (EP,US);
G02B6/3843 (EP,US);
G02B6/3846 (EP,US);
G02B6/382 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/26] | Title | German: | Steckerstift eines optischen Steckers und Methode seiner Herstellung | [1990/26] | English: | Optical connector ferrule and method for assembling the same | [1990/26] | French: | Embout d'un connecteur optique et méthode pour l'assembler | [1990/26] | Examination procedure | 16.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/26] | 26.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.11.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.10.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8707035 (AMP INC [US]); | [A]EP0171614 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 119 (P-453)[2176], 6th May 1986; & JP-A³60 247 204 (SUMITOMO DENKI KOGYO) 06-12-1985 |