EP0381855 - Misfire detection device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.12.1991 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.1992 | Change - applicant | published on 01.04.1992 [1992/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/14] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1990/33] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GmbH Wernerstrasse 1 D-70469 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Denz, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing. Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 59 D-7000 Stuttgart 1 / DE | 02 /
Herden, Werner, Dr.-Dipl.-Ing. Kappelweg 7 D-7016 Gerlingen / DE | [1990/33] | Application number, filing date | 89123778.6 | 22.12.1989 | [1990/33] | Priority number, date | DE19893903566 | 07.02.1989 Original published format: DE 3903566 | [1990/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0381855 | Date: | 16.08.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0381855 | Date: | 28.11.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F02P11/06, F02D41/14, G01L23/24 | [1990/50] | CPC: |
G01M15/106 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1990/33] | F02P11/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1990/33] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Erkennung von Zündaussetzern | [1990/33] | English: | Misfire detection device | [1990/33] | French: | Dispositif pour la détection de ratés d'allumage | [1990/33] | File destroyed: | 12.03.1999 | Examination procedure | 29.05.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/04] | 03.09.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1992/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 02.03.1990 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   17.03.1990 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 05.07.1991 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2766441 (WHITTLE JR BENJAMIN); | [X]US3924457 (OSHIMA YUJIRO, et al); | [A]FR2277249 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]); | [A]US3978719 (HADDEN STEPHEN CLOW, et al); | [A]GB2100006 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]); | [X]DE3532284 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]); | [A]DE8712497U |