EP0379722 - Retaining element consisting of plastics [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.03.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.05.1993 [1993/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TRW United-Carr GmbH & Co. KG Am Pulverhäuschen 7 67677 Enkenbach-Alsenborn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/31] | For all designated states TRW United-Carr GmbH & Co. KG Am Pulverhäuschen 7 D-67677 Enkenbach-Alsenborn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kraus, Willibald Industriestrasse 6 D-6718 Grünstadt / DE | 02 /
Rückwardt, Hans-Werner Beethovenstrasse 33 D-6719 Eisenberg / DE | [1990/31] | Representative(s) | Schieschke, Klaus, et al Patentanwälte Eder & Schieschke Elisabethstrasse 34 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/31] | Schieschke, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. E. Eder Dipl.-Ing. K. Schieschke Elisabethstrasse 34 D-80796 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89123839.6 | 22.12.1989 | [1990/31] | Priority number, date | DE19893902498 | 27.01.1989 Original published format: DE 3902498 | [1990/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0379722 | Date: | 01.08.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0379722 | Date: | 20.05.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F16L3/22, H02G3/26, B60R11/00 | [1990/31] | CPC: |
F16L55/035 (EP,US);
B60R16/08 (EP,US);
F16L3/223 (EP,US);
H02G3/263 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | ES, FR, GB, SE [1990/31] | Title | German: | Aus Kunststoff bestehendes Halteelement | [1990/31] | English: | Retaining element consisting of plastics | [1990/31] | French: | Elément de retenue consistant en matières plastiques | [1990/31] | Examination procedure | 15.06.1990 | Examination requested [1990/33] | 22.02.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.11.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 11.02.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.02.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3047462 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]); | [A]DE3236981 (ERNST HANS HELLMUT); | [A]DE3708864 (UNITED CARR GMBH TRW [DE]) |