EP0378863 - Thermoplastic compositions containing oxetanyl groups [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1990/30] | Thermoplastic polymers containing oxetanyl groups | ||
[1994/07] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.12.1994 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.02.1995 [1995/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/30] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Piejko, Karl-Erwin, Dr. Unterscheider Weg 7A D-5060 Bergisch Gladbach 2 / DE | 02 /
Fengler, Gerd, Dr. Bethelstrasse 16 D-4150 Krefeld / DE | 03 /
Lütjens, Holger, Dr. Rybniker Strasse 12 D-5000 Köln 80 / DE | 04 /
Braese, Hans-Eberhard Käthe-Kollwitz-Strasse 3 D-5000 Köln 71 / DE | 05 /
Lindner, Christian, Dr. Im Wasserblech 11 D-5000 Köln 91 / DE | 06 /
Kirsch, Jürgen, Dr. Hahnenweg 1 D-5000 Köln 80 / DE | [1990/30] | Application number, filing date | 89124178.8 | 30.12.1989 | [1990/30] | Priority number, date | DE19893901030 | 14.01.1989 Original published format: DE 3901030 | [1990/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0378863 | Date: | 25.07.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0378863 | Date: | 29.08.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0378863 | Date: | 16.02.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C08F20/28, C08L57/00 | [1990/30] | CPC: |
C08F20/28 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1990/30] | Title | German: | Oxetanylgruppen enthaltende thermoplastische Formmassen | [1994/07] | English: | Thermoplastic compositions containing oxetanyl groups | [1994/07] | French: | Compositions thermoplastiques contenant des groupes oxétanyl | [1994/07] |
Former [1990/30] | Oxetanylgruppen enthaltende thermoplastische Polymerisate | ||
Former [1990/30] | Thermoplastic polymers containing oxetanyl groups | ||
Former [1990/30] | Polymères thermoplastiques contenant des groupes oxétanyl | Examination procedure | 30.12.1989 | Examination requested [1990/30] | 16.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.04.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.08.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3105838 (LUSKIN LEO S); | [A]US3417102 (BRAUN ROBERT A) |