EP0326205 - Channel allocation controller and signal distribution network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1989/31] | Signal distribution network | ||
[1994/50] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.1995 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For:GB
PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LIMITED 420-430 London Road Croydon CR9 3QR / GB | For:BE
CH
DE
ES
FR
IT
LI
NL
SE
AT
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1989/31] | For:GB
PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LIMITED 420-430 London Road Croydon CR9 3QR / GB | ||
For:BE
CH
DE
ES
FR
IT
LI
NL
SE
AT
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baxter, Thomas c/o PHILIPS COMPONENTS New Road Mitcham Junction Mitcham Surrey CR4 4XY / GB | [1989/31] | Representative(s) | Andrews, Arthur Stanley, et al Philips Electronics UK Limited Patents and Trade Marks Department Cross Oak Lane Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/06] | Andrews, Arthur Stanley, et al Philips Electronics UK Limited Patents and Trade Marks Department Cross Oak Lane Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | ||
Former [1989/31] | Cole, Bernard Victor PHILIPS ELECTRONICS Patents and Trade Marks Department Philips House 188 Tottenham Court Road London W1P 9LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 89200091.0 | 17.01.1989 | [1989/31] | Priority number, date | GB19880001440 | 22.01.1988 Original published format: GB 8801440 | [1989/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0326205 | Date: | 02.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0326205 | Date: | 24.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0326205 | Date: | 14.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/20, H04H1/04, H04J1/12 | [1994/50] | CPC: |
H04H60/97 (EP,US);
H04N7/10 (KR);
H04B1/205 (EP,US);
H04J1/12 (EP,US);
H04N7/106 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1989/31] | H04B1/20, H04H1/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/31] | Title | German: | Bandverteiler und Signalverteilungsnetz | [1994/50] | English: | Channel allocation controller and signal distribution network | [1994/50] | French: | Contrôleur de répartition de canaux et réseau de distribution de signaux | [1994/50] |
Former [1989/31] | Signalverteilungsnetz | ||
Former [1989/31] | Signal distribution network | ||
Former [1989/31] | Réseau de distribution de signaux | Examination procedure | 21.10.1991 | Examination requested [1991/51] | 06.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.11.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.06.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 14.12.1994 | CH | 14.12.1994 | ES | 14.12.1994 | IT | 14.12.1994 | LI | 14.12.1994 | NL | 14.12.1994 | SE | 14.03.1995 | [2008/01] |
Former [2002/24] | BE | 14.12.1994 | |
CH | 14.12.1994 | ||
ES | 14.12.1994 | ||
IT | 14.12.1994 | ||
LI | 14.12.1994 | ||
NL | 14.12.1994 | ||
SE | 14.03.1995 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 14.12.1994 | |
CH | 14.12.1994 | ||
IT | 14.12.1994 | ||
LI | 14.12.1994 | ||
NL | 14.12.1994 | ||
SE | 14.03.1995 | ||
Former [1995/42] | BE | 14.12.1994 | |
CH | 14.12.1994 | ||
LI | 14.12.1994 | ||
NL | 14.12.1994 | ||
SE | 14.03.1995 | ||
Former [1995/35] | CH | 14.12.1994 | |
LI | 14.12.1994 | ||
NL | 14.12.1994 | ||
Former [1995/31] | CH | 14.12.1994 | |
LI | 14.12.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0015797 (SCART [FR]); | [Y]WO8202303 (DELTAKABEL BV [NL], et al); | [A]FR2530906 (LIGNES TELEGRAPH TELEPHON [FR]); | [A]US4648122 (HASEGAWA YONOSUKE [JP], et al); | [Y]EP0213929 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP], et al) |