EP0328195 - Pneumatic electronic valve actuator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.03.1994 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.03.1994 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.04.1994 [1994/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAGNAVOX ELECTRONIC SYSTEMS COMPANY 1313 Production Road Fort Wayne Indiana 46808 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/16] | For all designated states MAGNAVOX ELECTRONIC SYSTEMS COMPANY 1313 Production Road Fort Wayne Indiana 46808 / US | ||
Former [1989/33] | For all designated states Magnavox Government and Industrial Electronics Company 1313 Production Road Fort Wayne Indiana 46808 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Richeson, William Edmond c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof.Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Erickson, Frederick Logan c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof.Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1989/33] | Representative(s) | Cuppens, Hubertus Martinus Maria, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1989/33] | Cuppens, Hubertus Martinus Maria, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 89200227.0 | 02.02.1989 | [1989/33] | Priority number, date | US19880153257 | 08.02.1988 Original published format: US 153257 | [1989/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0328195 | Date: | 16.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0328195 | Date: | 07.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F01L9/02, F01L9/04 | [1989/33] | CPC: |
F02D13/0215 (EP,KR,US);
F01L13/0005 (EP,KR,US);
F01L9/16 (EP,US);
F01L9/20 (EP,US);
F02D13/0261 (EP,KR,US);
F02D13/0269 (EP,KR,US);
F01L2201/00 (EP,KR,US);
F02D2013/0296 (EP,KR,US);
F02D2041/001 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1989/33] | Title | German: | Pneumatisches elektronisches Ventilbetätigungselement | [1989/33] | English: | Pneumatic electronic valve actuator | [1989/33] | French: | Vérin de soupape électropneumatique | [1989/33] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 04.09.1990 | Examination requested [1990/44] | 11.10.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.04.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.09.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.02.1994 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1994/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP61258927 ; | DE421002 [ ] (AVIATION LOUIS BREGUET SA); | FR2133288 [ ] (PENHOET LOIRE ATLAN CHAN); | [X]GB1303080 ; | US3844528 [ ] (MASSIE P); | [A]GB2003979 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG); | [A]US4499872 (WARD MICHAEL A V [US], et al) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Vol. 11, No. 114 (M-579), April 10, 1987; & JP-A-61 258 927 (K. TOSHIKAZU) 17-11-1986, Abstract., & JP61258927 A 00000000 | [A] - AUTOMOTIVE ENGINEERING; Vol. 90, No. 4, April 1982, pages 51-55; Warrendale, US, "Engine load controlled via early intake valve closing". |