EP0327182 - A merchandising counter with an electronic weighing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.1992 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.03.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.04.1992 [1992/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEC-KEYLARD WEEGSCHALEN NEDERLAND B.V. Parallelweg 6 NL-1541 BA Koog aan de Zaan / NL | [1989/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oerlemans, Harm Ringweg 6 NL-1852 CM Heiloo / NL | [1989/32] | Representative(s) | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., et al Vereenigde Postbus 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1989/32] | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., Ir., et al Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 97 NL-2587 BN 's-Gravenhage / NL | Application number, filing date | 89200234.6 | 03.02.1989 | [1989/32] | Priority number, date | NL19880000278 | 05.02.1988 Original published format: NL 8800278 | [1989/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0327182 | Date: | 09.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0327182 | Date: | 02.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G01G19/52, A47F9/00 | [1989/32] | CPC: |
A47F3/007 (EP);
G01G19/52 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, NL [1989/32] | Title | German: | Ladentisch mit elektronischem Wägegerät | [1991/18] | English: | A merchandising counter with an electronic weighing device | [1989/32] | French: | Comptoir pour marchandises avec un dispositif électronique de pesage | [1989/32] |
Former [1989/32] | Ladentisch mit elektronischem Wiegegerät | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 18.09.1989 | Examination requested [1989/46] | 07.08.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.10.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.12.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 27.12.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.02.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]GB2085295 ; | [YD]EP0018656 ; | [A]DE3003255 |