EP0330267 - Loading device and disc record player comprising the loading device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.11.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1989/35] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Decoster, Michel Henri François c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1989/35] | Representative(s) | Schrijnemaekers, Hubert J.M., et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1989/35] | Schrijnemaekers, Hubert Joannes Maria, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 89200388.0 | 17.02.1989 | [1989/35] | Priority number, date | NL19880000448 | 23.02.1988 Original published format: NL 8800448 | [1989/35] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0330267 | Date: | 30.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0330267 | Date: | 26.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G11B17/04 | [1989/35] | CPC: |
G11B17/056 (EP,US);
G11B17/04 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB [1989/35] | Title | German: | Ladevorrichtung sowie mit der Ladevorrichtung versehener Plattenspieler | [1989/35] | English: | Loading device and disc record player comprising the loading device | [1989/35] | French: | Dispositif de chargement et tournedisque muni de ce dispositif de chargement | [1989/35] | Examination procedure | 22.02.1990 | Examination requested [1990/16] | 22.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.08.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.10.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 26.01.1994 | ES | 26.01.1994 | [2002/24] |
Former [1994/48] | BE | 26.01.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0109710 (PHILIPS NV [NL]); | [A]EP0145052 (PHILIPS NV [NL]); | [AD]EP0149532 (SONY CORP [JP]); | [A]DE3707846 (ALPS ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) |