EP0332268 - Display and pick-up device for stereoscopic picture display [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1989/37] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Verhulst, Antonius Gerardus Hendrikus c/o Int. Octrooibureau B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 Nl-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1989/37] | Representative(s) | Raap, Adriaan Yde, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1989/37] | Raap, Adriaan Yde, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 89200542.2 | 06.03.1989 | [1989/37] | Priority number, date | NL19880000595 | 10.03.1988 Original published format: NL 8800595 | [1989/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0332268 | Date: | 13.09.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0332268 | Date: | 16.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H04N13/00, G02F1/133 | [1989/37] | CPC: |
H04N13/337 (EP,US);
H04N13/00 (KR);
H04N13/218 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1989/37] | Title | German: | Wiedergabe- und Aufnahmeanordnung für stereoskopische Bildwiedergabe | [1989/37] | English: | Display and pick-up device for stereoscopic picture display | [1989/37] | French: | Dispositif de reproduction et de prise de vues pour la reproduction d'images stéréoscopiques | [1989/37] | Examination procedure | 09.03.1990 | Examination requested [1990/18] | 14.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.12.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 16.06.1993 | NL | 16.06.1993 | SE | 16.06.1993 | [2008/01] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 16.06.1993 | |
NL | 16.06.1993 | ||
SE | 16.06.1993 | ||
Former [1994/09] | NL | 16.06.1993 | |
SE | 16.06.1993 | ||
Former [1994/01] | NL | 16.06.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP61264875 ; | [A]DE2308311 (KRATOMI SHUNSEI); | [X]GB1523436 (SECR DEFENCE); | [A]FR2390751 (ELTRO GMBH [DE]); | [X]US4281341 (BYATT DENNIS W G) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 11, no. 117 (E-498)[2564], 11th April 1987; & JP-A-61 264 875 (FUJITSU GENERAL LTD) 22-11-1986, & JP61264875 A 00000000 |