EP0325338 - Cable head shock isolation assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.12.1993 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HALLIBURTON COMPANY P.O. Drawer 1431 Duncan Oklahoma 73536 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/30] | For all designated states HALLIBURTON COMPANY P.O. Drawer 1431 Duncan Oklahoma 73536 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Busch, Randolph Arthur 3002 Green Fields Sugarland Texas 77479 / US | [1989/30] | Representative(s) | Wain, Christopher Paul, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/30] | Wain, Christopher Paul, et al A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 89200583.6 | 10.04.1986 | [1989/30] | Priority number, date | US19850724365 | 17.04.1985 Original published format: US 724365 | [1989/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0325338 | Date: | 26.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0325338 | Date: | 09.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0325338 | Date: | 10.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | E21B17/02, E21B47/00 | [1989/30] | CPC: |
E21B47/017 (EP,US);
E21B17/023 (EP,US);
E21B17/028 (EP,US);
E21B17/06 (EP,US);
E21B17/07 (EP,US);
H01R13/523 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1989/30] | Title | German: | Anordnung zum Isolieren von Schockwellen in einem Kabelkopf | [1989/30] | English: | Cable head shock isolation assembly | [1989/30] | French: | Disposition pour isoler des chocs dans une tête de câble | [1989/30] | Examination procedure | 09.02.1990 | Examination requested [1990/15] | 04.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.01.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 30.07.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 10.08.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 23.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP86302673.8 / EP0198672 | Opposition(s) | 11.11.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 10.02.1993 | AT | 10.04.1993 | GB | 10.05.1993 | NL | 01.11.1993 | [2006/14] |
Former [1994/46] | AT | 10.04.1993 | |
GB | 10.05.1993 | ||
FR | 02.07.1993 | ||
NL | 01.11.1993 | ||
Former [1994/23] | GB | 10.05.1993 | |
FR | 02.07.1993 | ||
Former [1994/22] | GB | 10.05.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US1839690 (CHESTER MALINOWSKI); | [Y]US2935302 (PAUL CAVINS); | [A]US3551012 (SUTLIFF WAYNE N, et al); | [A]US3923105 (LANDS JR JACK F); | [A]US4275786 (LEE ARLEY G); | [A]EP0033405 (WELL CONTROL INC [US]) | Examination | US3517740 |