EP0337533 - A power-driven soil cultivating machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.12.1993 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states C. van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10 P.O. Box 26 3155 PD Maasland / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1989/42] | For all designated states C. van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10 P.O. Box 26 NL-3155 PD Maasland / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bom, Cornelis Johannes Gerardus 16 Laan van Nieuw Rozenburg Rozenburg / NL | [1989/42] | Representative(s) | Mulder, Herman, et al Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10 3155 PD Maasland / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1989/42] | Mulder, Herman, et al Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10 NL-3155 PD Maasland / NL | Application number, filing date | 89200746.9 | 23.03.1989 | [1989/42] | Priority number, date | NL19880000800 | 30.03.1988 Original published format: NL 8800800 | [1989/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0337533 | Date: | 18.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0337533 | Date: | 14.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0337533 | Date: | 10.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A01B49/04 | [1989/42] | CPC: |
A01B49/065 (EP);
A01B59/048 (EP);
A01B59/064 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1989/42] | Title | German: | Mechanisch angetriebenes Bodenbearbeitungsgerät | [1989/42] | English: | A power-driven soil cultivating machine | [1989/42] | French: | Engin à moteur de culture de la terre | [1989/42] | Examination procedure | 06.08.1990 | Examination requested [1990/40] | 12.12.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.05.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.08.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.11.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 10.02.1993 | IT | 10.02.1993 | [2008/01] |
Former [2002/24] | ES | 10.02.1993 | |
IT | 10.02.1993 | ||
Former [1999/42] | IT | 10.02.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0198563 ; | EP0199406 [ ]; | EP0216003 [ ] | Examination | FR2622762 |