EP0341772 - System for the course correction of a spinning projectile [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1989/46] | System for determining the angular spin position of an object spinning about an axis | ||
[1993/31] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.1994 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.07.1994 [1994/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOLLANDSE SIGNAALAPPARATEN B.V. Zuidelijke Havenweg 40 7554 RR Hengelo / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1992/22] | For all designated states HOLLANDSE SIGNAALAPPARATEN B.V. Zuidelijke Havenweg 40 NL-7554 RR Hengelo / NL | ||
Former [1989/46] | For all designated states HOLLANDSE SIGNAALAPPARATEN B.V. Zuidelijke Havenweg 40 P.O. Box 42 NL-7550 GD Hengelo / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yff, Louis Simon Anthoniusstraat 21 NL-7553 WB Hengelo / NL | [1989/46] | Application number, filing date | 89201108.1 | 01.05.1989 | [1989/46] | Priority number, date | NL19880001203 | 09.05.1988 Original published format: NL 8801203 | NL19890000117 | 19.01.1989 Original published format: NL 8900117 | [1989/46] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0341772 | Date: | 15.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0341772 | Date: | 04.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F41G7/30 | [1989/46] | CPC: |
F41G7/305 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/46] | Title | German: | System zur Kurskorrektur eines rotierenden Projektils | [1993/31] | English: | System for the course correction of a spinning projectile | [1993/31] | French: | Système pour corriger la trajectoire d'un projectile en rotation | [1993/31] |
Former [1989/46] | System zur Bestimmung der Rollposition eines um eine Achse rotierenden Objektes | ||
Former [1989/46] | System for determining the angular spin position of an object spinning about an axis | ||
Former [1989/46] | Système pour la détermination de la position de roulis d'un objet tournant autour d'un axe | Examination procedure | 12.04.1990 | Examination requested [1990/24] | 25.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.01.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.04.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 02.04.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.05.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2932026 (ROY MOFFETT LE, et al); | [A]US4646990 (CLEVELAND JR WILLIAM C [US]); | [AD]EP0239156 (HOLLANDSE SIGNAALAPPARATEN BV [NL]) | [A] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INSTRUMENTATION AND MEASUREMENT, vol. IM-29, no. 4, December 1980, pages 462-466, IEEE, New York, US; J.B. KUIPERS: "SPASYN - An electromagnetic relative position and orientation tracking system" | [A] - ELECTRICAL COMMUNICATION, vol. 48, no. 4, 1973, pages 444-452; H. POPP: "New generation all solid state radio navigation aids" |