EP0342747 - Directed optical signaling [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.07.1995 [1995/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1989/47] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Braakman, Herman Wichert Theodoor c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1989/47] | Representative(s) | de Jongh, Cornelis Dominicus, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1989/47] | De Jongh, Cornelis Dominicus, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 89201205.5 | 12.05.1989 | [1989/47] | Priority number, date | NL19880001274 | 18.05.1988 Original published format: NL 8801274 | [1989/47] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0342747 | Date: | 23.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0342747 | Date: | 27.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H01H13/02, G02B6/00 | [1989/47] | CPC: |
H01H13/023 (EP,US);
H01H13/02 (KR);
G02B6/0001 (EP,US);
H01H2219/062 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1989/47] | Title | German: | Gerichtete optische Signalisierung | [1989/47] | English: | Directed optical signaling | [1989/47] | French: | Signalisation optique dirigée | [1989/47] | Examination procedure | 18.05.1990 | Examination requested [1990/29] | 07.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.02.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4052591 (SEKERA JR GEORGE F, et al); | [Y]DE2825833 (STANDARD ELEKTRIK LORENZ AG); | [A]FR2477764 (OREGA ELECTRO MECANIQUE [FR]); | [Y]DE3202080 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO [JP]); | [Y]DE8437099U ; | [A]US4683359 (WOJTANEK GUY A [US]) |