EP0345841 - Piston engine, and a compression device provided with two piston engines and a cryogenic cooler [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.01.1993 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.03.1993 [1993/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1989/50] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Den Heijer, Ronald c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Goverde, Godefridus Cornelis c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
Simons, Peter Gertrudis Maria c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1989/50] | Representative(s) | Cuppens, Hubertus Martinus Maria, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1989/50] | Cuppens, Hubertus Martinus Maria, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 89201222.0 | 16.05.1989 | [1989/50] | Priority number, date | NL19880001293 | 19.05.1988 Original published format: NL 8801293 | [1989/50] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0345841 | Date: | 13.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0345841 | Date: | 25.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F01B11/00, F16C29/02, F16C31/02, F01B7/20 | [1989/50] | CPC: |
F01B11/001 (EP,US);
F01B7/20 (EP,US);
F02G1/0435 (EP,US);
F25B9/14 (EP,US);
F02G2270/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1989/50] | Title | German: | Kolbenmaschine, Kompressorvorrichtung mit zwei Kolbenmaschinen und Gaskühler mit einer derartigen Kolbenmaschine | [1989/50] | English: | Piston engine, and a compression device provided with two piston engines and a cryogenic cooler | [1989/50] | French: | Machine à pistons, dispositif de compression muni de deux machines à pistons et d'un refroidisseur cryogène | [1992/13] |
Former [1989/50] | Machine à pistons, Dispositif de compression muni de deux machines à pistons et d'un refroidisseur cryogène | Examination procedure | 11.06.1990 | Examination requested [1990/32] | 26.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 23.09.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 27.09.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.12.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0223288 (PHILIPS NV [NL]); | [A]DE330835 (FRANZ SCHENK); | [A]NL1105157C ; | [A]CH479001 (INDUSTRIEZWEIGINSTITUT GUMMI U [DE]); | [A]GB1145811 (BRITISH AIRCRAFT CORP LTD); | [A]BE880897 (VOKAER DIDIER) | Examination | NL105157C |