EP0399108 - Polyester/epoxy block copolymer as binder for metal primer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.09.1991 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.1991 | Change - withdrawal | published on 06.11.1991 [1991/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Akzo N.V. Velperweg 76 NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1990/48] | For all designated states AKZO N.V. Velperweg 76 NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Segura, Serge 45 Rue Blanche F-60270 Gouvieux / FR | 02 /
Bouvier, Daniel 19, Rue de la Garenne F-60300 Avilly St. Leonard / FR | 03 /
Nota, Gabriel 36, Rue Victor Hugo F-60500 Chantilly / FR | 04 /
Tournillon, Christine 3, Allée Renoir F-95270, Belloy en France / FR | [1990/48] | Representative(s) | Sieders, René, et al AKZO NOBEL N.V. Patent Department (Dept. CO) P.O. Box 9300 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1990/48] | Sieders, René, et al AKZO NOBEL N.V. Patent Department (Dept. CO) P.O. Box 9300 NL-6800 SB Arnhem / NL | Application number, filing date | 89201350.9 | 26.05.1989 | [1990/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0399108 | Date: | 28.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C08G81/00, C09D163/00, C09D167/00 | [1990/48] | CPC: |
C09D187/005 (EP);
C08G81/00 (EP);
C09D163/00 (EP);
C09D167/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C09D163/00, C08L2666/18 (EP);
C09D167/00, C08L2666/22 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/48] | Title | German: | Polyester/Epoxid-Blockcopolymerisat als Bindemittel für Metallgrundierung | [1990/48] | English: | Polyester/epoxy block copolymer as binder for metal primer | [1990/48] | French: | Copolymère bloc polyester/époxy utilisé comme liant pour revêtement primaire pour métaux | [1990/48] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 28.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/10] | 05.09.1991 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1991/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 30.05.1990 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   08.06.1990 | 30.05.1990 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   08.06.1990 | 30.05.1990 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   08.06.1990 | 30.05.1990 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   08.06.1990 | 30.05.1990 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   08.06.1990 | 30.05.1990 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   08.06.1990 | 30.05.1990 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   08.06.1990 | 30.05.1990 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   08.06.1990 | 30.05.1990 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   08.06.1990 | 30.05.1990 | LI   M01   Fee paid on   08.06.1990 | 30.05.1990 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   08.06.1990 | 30.05.1990 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   08.06.1990 | 30.05.1990 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   08.06.1990 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]CA703916 ; | [YD]EP0111986 ; | [Y]DE2037701 ; | [A]CH557397 ; | [A]EP0165207 |