EP0345877 - Magneto-optical recorder with a modulated magnetic field [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.07.1995 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | For all designated states Philips and Du Pont Optical Company Buizerdlaan 2 3435 SB Nieuwegein / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1989/50] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
For all designated states Philips and Du Pont Optical Company Buizerdlaan 2 NL-3435 SB Nieuwegein / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van Nieuwland, Jacob c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Heemskerk, Jacobus c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
Bakx, Johannes c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
Janse, Jan Jozias c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1989/50] | Representative(s) | Groenendaal, Antonius W. M. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1991/51] | Groenendaal, Antonius Wilhelmus Maria INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1989/50] | Jacquard, Philippe Société Civile S.P.I.D. 156, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 89201398.8 | 01.06.1989 | [1989/50] | Priority number, date | FR19880007544 | 07.06.1988 Original published format: FR 8807544 | [1989/50] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0345877 | Date: | 13.12.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0345877 | Date: | 07.09.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G11B11/10 | [1989/50] | CPC: |
G11B11/10595 (EP,US);
G11B13/04 (KR);
G11B11/10508 (EP,US);
G11B11/10534 (EP,US);
G11B11/10576 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1989/50] | Title | German: | Magneto-optisches Aufzeichnungsgerät mit moduliertem Magnetfeld | [1989/50] | English: | Magneto-optical recorder with a modulated magnetic field | [1989/50] | French: | Enregistreur magnéto-optique à champ magnétique modulé | [1989/50] | Examination procedure | 11.06.1990 | Examination requested [1990/32] | 10.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.12.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.09.1994 | ES | 07.09.1994 | IT | 07.09.1994 | NL | 07.09.1994 | SE | 07.12.1994 | [2002/24] |
Former [1999/42] | AT | 07.09.1994 | |
IT | 07.09.1994 | ||
NL | 07.09.1994 | ||
SE | 07.12.1994 | ||
Former [1997/17] | AT | 07.09.1994 | |
NL | 07.09.1994 | ||
SE | 07.12.1994 | ||
Former [1995/29] | AT | 07.09.1994 | |
NL | 07.09.1994 | ||
SE | 07.12.1994 | ||
Former [1995/16] | NL | 07.09.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP57133503 ; | [X]GB2119558 (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP); | [X]GB2119999 (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP); | [A]EP0164745 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 6, no. 233 (P-156)(1111) 19 novembre 1982, & JP-A-57 133503 (SHARP K.K.) 18 août 1982,, & JP57133503 A 00000000 |