EP0345886 - Alginate gels [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.10.1994 [1994/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KELCO INTERNATIONAL LIMITED Westminster Tower 3 Albert Embankment London SE1 7RZ / GB | [1989/51] |
Former [1989/50] | For all designated states Kelco International Limited Westminster Tower 3 Albert Embankment London SE1 7 RZ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bennett, Alexander N. 11 Hutchins Way Horley Surrey / GB | [1989/50] | Representative(s) | Cole, William Gwyn European Patent Department Merck & Co., Inc. Terlings Park Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/20] | Cole, William Gwyn European Patent Department Merck & Co., Inc. Terlings Park Eastwick Road Harlow Essex CM20 2QR / GB | ||
Former [1989/50] | Hesketh, Alan, Dr. European Patent Department Merck & Co., Inc. Terlings Park Eastwick Road Harlow Essex, CM20 2QR / GB | Application number, filing date | 89201418.4 | 05.06.1989 | [1989/50] | Priority number, date | GB19880013773 | 10.06.1988 Original published format: GB 8813773 | [1989/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0345886 | Date: | 13.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0345886 | Date: | 27.02.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0345886 | Date: | 20.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/05, A23L1/314 | [1993/42] | CPC: |
A23C9/1546 (EP);
A23L13/422 (EP);
A23L13/52 (EP);
A23L19/19 (EP);
A23L29/256 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1989/50] | A23L1/04, A23L1/314 | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/50] | Title | German: | Alginatgele | [1989/50] | English: | Alginate gels | [1989/50] | French: | Gels d'alginate | [1989/50] | Examination procedure | 26.06.1991 | Examination requested [1991/34] | 02.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.04.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US1827991 (ALBERT LEO); | [X]US2809893 (POARCH ARTHUR E, et al); | [A]US3480450 (EDLIN RAY L, et al); | [Y]GB1254562 (SPICE & FLAVOUR SERVICES LTD); | [A]FR2462105 (QUAKER OATS LTD [GB]); | [YD]US4603054 (SCHMIDT GLENN R [US], et al) |