EP0347999 - Electric switch structure in which the actuation axial force is just a small portion of the contact force [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.1996 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.2003 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): NL | published on 12.03.2003 [2003/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CGE- COMPAGNIA GENERALE ELETTROMECCANICA S.p.A. Via Tortona 27 I-20144 Milan / IT | [1989/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pardini, Franco Paolo Via Dei Biancospini 3 I-20146 Milan / IT | [1989/52] | Representative(s) | Michelotti, Giuliano, et al Dragotti & Associati Srl Via Nino Bixio, 7 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1989/52] | Michelotti, Giuliano, et al c/o SAIC BREVETTI S.r.l. Galleria San Babila, 4/D I-20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 89201606.4 | 20.06.1989 | [1989/52] | Priority number, date | IT19880021478U | 23.06.1988 Original published format: IT 2147888 U | [1989/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0347999 | Date: | 27.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0347999 | Date: | 17.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0347999 | Date: | 05.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H01H50/54, H01H1/20 | [1989/52] | CPC: |
H01H1/2075 (EP,US);
H01H15/102 (EP,US);
H01H50/545 (EP,US);
H01H11/0012 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/52] | Title | German: | Elektrische Schalteinrichtung, bei der die axiale Betätigungskraft nur einen kleinen Teil der Kontaktkraft ausmacht | [1989/52] | English: | Electric switch structure in which the actuation axial force is just a small portion of the contact force | [1989/52] | French: | Agencement de commutation électrique dans laquelle la force d'actionnement axiale n'est qu'une petite fraction de la force de contact | [1989/52] | Examination procedure | 31.12.1991 | Examination requested [1992/15] | 17.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.10.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.12.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 29.12.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.04.1995 | BE | 05.04.1995 | CH | 05.04.1995 | GR | 05.04.1995 | LI | 05.04.1995 | NL | 05.04.1995 | LU | 30.06.1995 | GB | 05.07.1995 | SE | 05.07.1995 | [2003/11] |
Former [2000/27] | AT | 05.04.1995 | |
BE | 05.04.1995 | ||
CH | 05.04.1995 | ||
GR | 05.04.1995 | ||
LI | 05.04.1995 | ||
LU | 30.06.1995 | ||
NL | 30.06.1995 | ||
GB | 05.07.1995 | ||
SE | 05.07.1995 | ||
Former [2000/04] | AT | 05.04.1995 | |
BE | 05.04.1995 | ||
CH | 05.04.1995 | ||
GR | 05.04.1995 | ||
LI | 05.04.1995 | ||
LU | 30.06.1995 | ||
GB | 05.07.1995 | ||
SE | 05.07.1995 | ||
Former [1996/30] | AT | 05.04.1995 | |
BE | 05.04.1995 | ||
CH | 05.04.1995 | ||
LI | 05.04.1995 | ||
GB | 05.07.1995 | ||
SE | 05.07.1995 | ||
Former [1996/04] | AT | 05.04.1995 | |
BE | 05.04.1995 | ||
CH | 05.04.1995 | ||
LI | 05.04.1995 | ||
SE | 05.07.1995 | ||
Former [1996/02] | AT | 05.04.1995 | |
CH | 05.04.1995 | ||
LI | 05.04.1995 | ||
Former [1995/44] | CH | 05.04.1995 | |
LI | 05.04.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3016440 (DRIES JEROME F); | [Y]DE2321993 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE); | [A]US4663502 (KANE HUGH [US], et al); | [Y]US4712079 (MARQUARDT TERRY L [US]) |