EP0350102 - Shelf bracket [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.10.1993 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAZO-STAALBEHEER B.V. T. Dobbeweg 8 NL-6883 GN Velp / NL | [1990/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
van der Goot, Arnold Voorbroek 9 NL-7161 GL Terborg / NL | [1990/02] | Representative(s) | Lips, Hendrik Jan George, et al HAAGSCH OCTROOIBUREAU Breitnerlaan 146 2596 HG Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1990/02] | Lips, Hendrik Jan George, Ir., et al HAAGSCH OCTROOIBUREAU Breitnerlaan 146 NL-2596 HG Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 89201715.3 | 29.06.1989 | [1990/02] | Priority number, date | NL19880001736 | 08.07.1988 Original published format: NL 8801736 | [1990/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0350102 | Date: | 10.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0350102 | Date: | 09.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A47B96/06 | [1990/02] | CPC: |
A47B96/061 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/02] | Title | German: | Konsole für Regale | [1990/02] | English: | Shelf bracket | [1990/02] | French: | Console pour tablette de rayonnage | [1990/02] | Examination procedure | 03.07.1990 | Examination requested [1990/35] | 02.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.05.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.09.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.12.1992 | BE | 09.12.1992 | CH | 09.12.1992 | DE | 09.12.1992 | ES | 09.12.1992 | FR | 09.12.1992 | GR | 09.12.1992 | IT | 09.12.1992 | LI | 09.12.1992 | SE | 09.12.1992 | GB | 29.06.1993 | LU | 30.06.1993 | [2006/14] |
Former [2002/24] | AT | 09.12.1992 | |
BE | 09.12.1992 | ||
CH | 09.12.1992 | ||
DE | 09.12.1992 | ||
ES | 09.12.1992 | ||
GR | 09.12.1992 | ||
IT | 09.12.1992 | ||
LI | 09.12.1992 | ||
SE | 09.12.1992 | ||
FR | 30.04.1993 | ||
GB | 29.06.1993 | ||
LU | 30.06.1993 | ||
Former [2000/04] | AT | 09.12.1992 | |
BE | 09.12.1992 | ||
CH | 09.12.1992 | ||
DE | 09.12.1992 | ||
GR | 09.12.1992 | ||
IT | 09.12.1992 | ||
LI | 09.12.1992 | ||
SE | 09.12.1992 | ||
FR | 30.04.1993 | ||
GB | 29.06.1993 | ||
LU | 30.06.1993 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 09.12.1992 | |
BE | 09.12.1992 | ||
CH | 09.12.1992 | ||
DE | 09.12.1992 | ||
IT | 09.12.1992 | ||
LI | 09.12.1992 | ||
SE | 09.12.1992 | ||
FR | 30.04.1993 | ||
GB | 29.06.1993 | ||
Former [1994/41] | AT | 09.12.1992 | |
BE | 09.12.1992 | ||
CH | 09.12.1992 | ||
DE | 09.12.1992 | ||
LI | 09.12.1992 | ||
SE | 09.12.1992 | ||
FR | 30.04.1993 | ||
GB | 29.06.1993 | ||
Former [1994/25] | AT | 09.12.1992 | |
BE | 09.12.1992 | ||
CH | 09.12.1992 | ||
DE | 09.12.1992 | ||
LI | 09.12.1992 | ||
SE | 09.12.1992 | ||
FR | 30.04.1993 | ||
Former [1993/48] | BE | 09.12.1992 | |
CH | 09.12.1992 | ||
DE | 09.12.1992 | ||
LI | 09.12.1992 | ||
SE | 09.12.1992 | ||
FR | 30.04.1993 | ||
Former [1993/38] | BE | 09.12.1992 | |
CH | 09.12.1992 | ||
DE | 09.12.1992 | ||
LI | 09.12.1992 | ||
SE | 09.12.1992 | ||
Former [1993/28] | CH | 09.12.1992 | |
DE | 09.12.1992 | ||
LI | 09.12.1992 | ||
SE | 09.12.1992 | ||
Former [1993/28] | CH | 09.12.1992 | |
DE | 09.12.1992 | ||
LI | 09.12.1992 | ||
Former [1993/23] | CH | 09.12.1992 | |
LI | 09.12.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CH84404 (ERISMANN FRITZ [CH]); | [X]GB298381 (JOSEPH HENRY BANKS, et al); | [X]US3194527 (JACK GRUSS); | [X]FR2590464 (BROS MANUF OUTILLA QUINCAILLER [FR]) |