EP0361554 - Use of ferritic chromium-molybdenum steels as materials resisting concentrated sulfuric acid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 23.10.1998 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states METALLGESELLSCHAFT AG Postfach 10 15 01 60015 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/14] | For all designated states METALLGESELLSCHAFT AG Postfach 10 15 01, Reuterweg 14 D-60015 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dörr, Karl-Heinz Am Gonsenheimer Spiess 6 D-6500 Mainz / DE | 02 /
Müller, Hermann Lehenthal 34 D-8650 Kulmbach / DE | 03 /
Sander, Ulrich, Dr. Taunusstrasse 116 D-6382 Friedrichsdorf / DE | 04 /
Schalk, Wolfram Geschw.-Scholl-Weg 4 D-6392 Neu-Anspach / DE | 05 /
Wallis, Ernst, Dr. Berliner Strasse 8 D-6236 Eschborn / DE | [1990/14] | Application number, filing date | 89202071.0 | 10.08.1989 | [1990/14] | Priority number, date | DE19883830365 | 07.09.1988 Original published format: DE 3830365 | [1990/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0361554 | Date: | 04.04.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0361554 | Date: | 09.06.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C22C38/48, C22C38/44 | [1990/14] | CPC: |
F28F21/082 (EP,US);
C22C38/44 (EP,US);
C22C38/48 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1990/14] | Title | German: | Verwendung von ferritischen Chrom-Molybdän-Stählen als gegen konzentrierte Schwefelsäure beständigem Werkstoff | [1990/14] | English: | Use of ferritic chromium-molybdenum steels as materials resisting concentrated sulfuric acid | [1990/14] | French: | Mise en oeuvre d'aciers ferritiques au chrome-molybdène comme matériau résistant à l'acide sulfurique concentré | [1990/14] | Examination procedure | 21.06.1990 | Examination requested [1990/33] | 03.01.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.05.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.12.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
25.02.1994
12.04.1994
ADMISSIBLE Bayer AG, Leverkusen Konzernverwaltung RP Patente Konzern Bayerwerk D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/17] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.02.1994
12.04.1994
ADMISSIBLE Bayer AG, Leverkusen Konzernverwaltung RP Patente Konzern Bayerwerk D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | 18.04.1994 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 30.07.1994 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 05.04.1995 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.04.1995 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 19.04.1995 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 17.09.1998 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1998/50] | Appeal following opposition | 04.05.1995 | Appeal received No. T0419/95 | 01.08.1995 | Statement of grounds filed | 17.09.1998 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 17.09.1998 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.09.1998 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2324752 (SANDVIK AB [SE]); | [A]FR2349659 (CRUCIBLE INC [US]); | [A]FR2197996 (SCHOELLER BLECKMANN STAHLWERKE [AT]); | [AD]DE3320527 (CANADIAN IND [CA]); | [A]DE3508532 (BAYER AG [DE]) | Examination | EP0018131 | - STAHL UND EISEN, 1990; Seite 73# | - STAHLSCHLÜSSEL, 1985; Seite 344, Nr. 41# | - STAHLSCHLÜSSEL, 1992; Seite 292, Nr. 1.4575# |